Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB240 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/06/2019

                    By: Nelson S.B. No. 240
 (In the Senate - Filed December 13, 2018; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 March 6, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of F-35 fighter jet specialty license
 plates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter G, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.671 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.671.  F-35 FIGHTER JET LICENSE PLATES.  (a)  The
 department shall issue specialty license plates that include the
 image of an F-35 fighter jet and the words "The Sound of Freedom."
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs, the remainder of the fee for issuance of the license plates
 shall be deposited to the credit of the general revenue fund.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *