Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB243 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/02/2019

                    By: Creighton, Hall S.B. No. 243
 (In the Senate - Filed December 14, 2018; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 2, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 4; April 2, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 243 By:  Bettencourt


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the carrying or storage of a handgun by a school
 marshal.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 37.0811(d) and (e), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Any written regulations adopted for purposes of
 Subsection (c) must provide that a [school marshal may carry a
 concealed handgun as described by Subsection (c), except that if
 the primary duty of the school marshal involves regular, direct
 contact with students, the marshal may not carry a concealed
 handgun but may possess a handgun on the physical premises of a
 school in a locked and secured safe within the marshal's immediate
 reach when conducting the marshal's primary duty.     The written
 regulations must also require that a] handgun carried or possessed
 by [or within access of] a school marshal may be loaded only with
 frangible duty ammunition approved for that purpose by the Texas
 Commission on Law Enforcement.
 (e)  A school marshal may use [access] a handgun the school
 marshal is authorized to carry or possess under this section only
 under circumstances that would justify the use of deadly force
 under Section 9.32 or 9.33, Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 37.0813(d) and (e), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (d)  Any written regulations adopted for purposes of
 Subsection (c) must provide that a [school marshal may carry a
 concealed handgun as described by Subsection (c), except that if
 the primary duty of the school marshal involves regular, direct
 contact with students in a classroom setting, the marshal may not
 carry a concealed handgun but may possess a handgun on the physical
 premises of a school in a locked and secured safe within the
 marshal's immediate reach when conducting the marshal's primary
 duty.    The written regulations must also require that a] handgun
 carried or possessed by [or within access of] a school marshal may
 be loaded only with frangible duty ammunition approved for that
 purpose by the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.
 (e)  A school marshal may use [access] a handgun the school
 marshal is authorized to carry or possess under this section only
 under circumstances that would justify the use of deadly force
 under Section 9.32 or 9.33, Penal Code.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 51.220(e) and (f), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (e)  Any written regulations adopted for purposes of
 Subsection (d) must provide that a [school marshal may carry a
 concealed] handgun [as described by Subsection (d), except that if
 the primary duty of the school marshal involves regular, direct
 contact with students, the marshal may not carry a concealed
 handgun but may possess a handgun on the physical premises of a
 public junior college campus in a locked and secured safe within the
 marshal's immediate reach when conducting the marshal's primary
 duty.    The written regulations must also require that a handgun]
 carried or possessed by [or within access of] a school marshal may
 be loaded only with frangible duty ammunition approved for that
 purpose by the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement.
 (f)  A school marshal may use [access] a handgun the school
 marshal is authorized to carry or possess under this section only
 under circumstances that would justify the use of deadly force
 under Section 9.32 or 9.33, Penal Code.
 SECTION 4.  This Act applies beginning with the 2019-2020
 school year.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *