Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB2535 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/24/2019

                    S.B. No. 2535


 AN ACT
 relating to the powers and duties of the Lakehaven Municipal
 Utility District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing
 authority to impose a tax.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subtitle F, Title 6, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by adding Chapter 8093 to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 8093. LAKEHAVEN MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT
 SUBCHAPTER A. GENERAL PROVISIONS
 Sec. 8093.0101.  DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
 (1)  "Board" means the district's board of directors.
 (2)  "City" means the City of Farmersville, Texas.
 (3)  "District" means the Lakehaven Municipal Utility
 District.
 Sec. 8093.0102.  NATURE AND PURPOSES OF DISTRICT. (a)  The
 district is a municipal utility district created under Section 59,
 Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 (b)  The district is created to accomplish the purposes of:
 (1)  a municipal utility district as provided by
 general law and Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution; and
 (2)  Section 52, Article III, Texas Constitution, that
 relate to the construction, acquisition, improvement, operation,
 or maintenance of macadamized, graveled, or paved roads, or
 improvements, including storm drainage, in aid of those roads.
 SUBCHAPTER B. POWERS AND DUTIES
 Sec. 8093.0201.  GENERAL POWERS AND DUTIES. The district
 has the powers and duties necessary to accomplish the purposes for
 which the district is created.
 Sec. 8093.0202.  MUNICIPAL UTILITY DISTRICT POWERS AND
 DUTIES. The district has the powers and duties provided by the
 general law of this state, including Chapters 49 and 54, Water Code,
 applicable to municipal utility districts created under Section 59,
 Article XVI, Texas Constitution.
 Sec. 8093.0203.  AUTHORITY FOR ROAD PROJECTS. Under Section
 52, Article III, Texas Constitution, the district may design,
 acquire, construct, finance, issue bonds for, improve, operate,
 maintain, and convey to this state, a county, or a municipality for
 operation and maintenance macadamized, graveled, or paved roads, or
 improvements, including storm drainage, in aid of those roads.
 Sec. 8093.0204.  ROAD STANDARDS AND REQUIREMENTS. (a)  A
 road project must meet all applicable construction standards and
 regulations of each municipality in whose corporate limits or
 extraterritorial jurisdiction the road project is located.
 (b)  If a road project is not located in the corporate limits
 or extraterritorial jurisdiction of a municipality, the road
 project must meet all applicable construction standards and
 regulations of each county in which the road project is located.
 (c)  If the state will maintain and operate the road, the
 Texas Transportation Commission must approve the plans and
 specifications of the road project.
 SUBCHAPTER C. BONDS AND OTHER OBLIGATIONS
 Sec. 8093.0301.  AUTHORITY TO ISSUE BONDS AND OTHER
 OBLIGATIONS FOR ROAD PROJECTS. (a)  Except as provided by Section
 8093.0303, the district may issue bonds or other obligations
 payable wholly or partly from ad valorem taxes, revenue, contract
 payments, grants, or other district money, or any combination of
 those sources, to pay for a road project authorized by Section
 8093.0203.
 (b)  The district may not issue bonds payable from ad valorem
 taxes to finance a road project unless the issuance is approved by a
 vote of a two-thirds majority of the district voters voting at an
 election held for that purpose.
 (c)  At the time of issuance, the total principal amount of
 bonds or other obligations issued or incurred to finance road
 projects and payable from ad valorem taxes may not exceed
 one-fourth of the assessed value of the real property in the
 district.
 Sec. 8093.0302.  TAXES FOR BONDS. At the time the district
 issues bonds payable wholly or partly from ad valorem taxes, the
 board shall provide for the annual imposition of a continuing
 direct ad valorem tax, without limit as to rate or amount, while all
 or part of the bonds are outstanding.
 Sec. 8093.0303.  CONDITION PRECEDENT TO ISSUING BONDS OR
 OTHER OBLIGATIONS. (a)  The district may not issue bonds or other
 obligations under this subchapter unless the district has entered
 into a contract with the city, Collin County, or another entity:
 (1)  for adequate supplemental police, fire, and
 emergency services for the district; and
 (2)  that is approved by the Commissioners Court of
 Collin County under Subsection (c).
 (b)  A contract under Subsection (a) may include a provision
 that the contract takes effect only on the approval of the
 Commissioners Court of Collin County and the voters in the district
 voting in an election held for that purpose.
 (c)  The Commissioners Court of Collin County shall review a
 contract under Subsection (a) and evaluate the supplemental police,
 fire, and emergency services provided in the contract. If the
 commissioners court determines that the contract provides adequate
 services, the commissioners court shall adopt a resolution stating
 that the contract has met the requirements of Subsection (a).
 SUBCHAPTER D. CITY PERMITTING AUTHORITY IN DISTRICT
 Sec. 8093.0401.  CITY AUTHORITY. (a)  The city has
 exclusive authority in the district to issue all building permits,
 certificates of occupancy, and any certificate or permit issued by
 the city relating to business activities.
 (b)  A fee for a permit or certificate issued by the city for
 use in the district may not exceed the fees charged for the same
 permit or certificate issued for use in the corporate limits of the
 city.
 (c)  A permit or certificate issued by the city for use in the
 district is subject to the terms of a development agreement made
 under Section 212.172, Local Government Code.
 SECTION 2.  The Lakehaven Municipal Utility District retains
 all the rights, powers, privileges, authority, duties, and
 functions that it had before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  (a) The legal notice of the intention to
 introduce this Act, setting forth the general substance of this
 Act, has been published as provided by law, and the notice and a
 copy of this Act have been furnished to all persons, agencies,
 officials, or entities to which they are required to be furnished
 under Section 59, Article XVI, Texas Constitution, and Chapter 313,
 Government Code.
 (b)  The governor, one of the required recipients, has
 submitted the notice and Act to the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality.
 (c)  The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality has filed
 its recommendations relating to this Act with the governor, the
 lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives within the required time.
 (d)  All requirements of the constitution and laws of this
 state and the rules and procedures of the legislature with respect
 to the notice, introduction, and passage of this Act are fulfilled
 and accomplished.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2535 passed the Senate on
 May 3, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; and that the
 Senate concurred in House amendment on May 23, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 2535 passed the House, with
 amendment, on May 17, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 121,
 Nays 26, two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor