By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 297 (In the Senate - Filed January 4, 2019; February 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation; April 4, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 1; April 4, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the disposition of fines for traffic violations collected by certain municipalities. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 542.402(g), Transportation Code, is amended to read as follows: (g) This subsection and Subsection (f) expire on September 1, 2031 [2021]. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *