Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB30 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/27/2019

                    S.B. No. 30


 AN ACT
 relating to ballot language requirements for a proposition seeking
 voter approval for the issuance of bonds.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 45.003, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (g) and (h) to read as follows:
 (g)  Notwithstanding Section 1251.052, Government Code, the
 question of whether to approve the issuance of bonds for the
 construction, acquisition, and equipment of school buildings in the
 district, the purchase of new school buses, and the purchase of
 necessary sites for school buildings may be submitted to the voters
 in a single ballot proposition, except that bonds for each of the
 following purposes must be stated in a separate proposition:
 (1)  the construction, acquisition, or equipment of a
 stadium with seating capacity for more than 1,000 spectators;
 (2)  the construction, acquisition, or equipment of a
 natatorium;
 (3)  the construction, acquisition, or equipment of
 another recreational facility other than a gymnasium, playground,
 or play area;
 (4)  the construction, acquisition, or equipment of a
 performing arts facility;
 (5)  the construction, acquisition, or equipment of
 housing for teachers as determined by the district to be necessary
 to have a sufficient number of teachers for the district; and
 (6)  an acquisition or update of technology equipment,
 other than equipment used for school security purposes or
 technology infrastructure integral to the construction of a
 facility.
 (h)  The question of whether to approve the issuance of bonds
 for a building described by Subsection (g)(1), (2), (3), (4), or (5)
 must be printed on the ballot as a separate ballot proposition
 regardless of whether that building is proposed as part of the same
 complex or building that contains traditional classroom
 facilities. Each separate ballot proposition required by this
 subsection must state the principal amount of the bonds to be issued
 that constitutes the cost for construction of that portion of the
 building or complex attributable to the building described by
 Subsection (g)(1), (2), (3), (4), or (5) or to the traditional
 classroom facilities, as applicable.
 SECTION 2.  Section 52.072(e), Election Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (e)  In addition to any other requirement imposed by law for
 a proposition, including a provision prescribing the proposition
 language, a proposition submitted to the voters for approval of the
 [issuance of bonds or the] imposition, increase, or reduction of a
 tax shall specifically state, as applicable:
 (1)  [with respect to a proposition seeking voter
 approval of the issuance of bonds:
 [(A)     the total principal amount of the bonds to
 be authorized, if approved; and
 [(B)     a   general description of the purposes for
 which the bonds are to be authorized, if approved;
 [(2)]  with respect to a proposition that only seeks
 voter approval of the imposition or increase of a tax, the amount of
 or maximum tax rate of the tax or tax increase for which approval is
 sought; or
 (2) [(3)]  with respect to a proposition that only
 seeks voter approval of the reduction of a tax, the amount of tax
 rate reduction or the tax rate for which approval is sought.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 1251, Government Code, is amended by
 designating Sections 1251.001, 1251.003, 1251.004, 1251.005, and
 1251.006 as Subchapter A and adding a subchapter heading to read as
 follows:
 SUBCHAPTER A. PROVISIONS RELATING GENERALLY TO COUNTY AND
 MUNICIPAL BOND ELECTIONS
 SECTION 4.  Chapter 1251, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter B to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER B. BALLOT FOR DEBT OBLIGATIONS ISSUED BY POLITICAL
 SUBDIVISION
 Sec. 1251.051.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Debt obligation" means a public security, as
 defined by Section 1201.002, secured by and payable from ad valorem
 taxes.  The term does not include public securities that are
 designated as self-supporting by the political subdivision issuing
 the securities.
 (2)  "Political subdivision" means a municipality,
 county, school district, or special taxing district.
 Sec. 1251.052.  FORM. (a)  The ballot for a measure seeking
 voter approval of the issuance of debt obligations by a political
 subdivision shall specifically state:
 (1)  a plain language description of the single
 specific purposes for which the debt obligations are to be
 authorized;
 (2)  the total principal amount of the debt obligations
 to be authorized; and
 (3)  that taxes sufficient to pay the principal of and
 interest on the debt obligations will be imposed.
 (a-1)  Each single specific purpose for which debt
 obligations requiring voter approval are to be issued must be
 printed on the ballot as a separate proposition.  A proposition may
 include as a specific purpose one or more structures or
 improvements serving the substantially same purpose and may include
 related improvements and equipment necessary to accomplish the
 specific purpose.
 SECTION 5.  Section 1251.002, Government Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 6.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an election ordered on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An election ordered before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect when the election was ordered, and the
 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 30 passed the Senate on
 April 11, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0;
 May 23, 2019, Senate refused to concur in House amendments and
 requested appointment of Conference Committee; May 23, 2019, House
 granted request of the Senate; May 26, 2019, Senate adopted
 Conference Committee Report by the following vote:  Yeas 31,
 Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 30 passed the House, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 137,
 Nays 5, three present not voting; May 23, 2019, House granted
 request of the Senate for appointment of Conference Committee;
 May 26, 2019, House adopted Conference Committee Report by the
 following vote:  Yeas 135, Nays 8, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor