Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB316 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/02/2019

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 316
 (In the Senate - Filed January 7, 2019; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 2, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 4; April 2, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 316 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the attorney general's duty to defend public school
 teachers.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The legislature finds that it is in the best
 interest of this state for the attorney general to defend a public
 school teacher in a civil action brought against the teacher if the
 attorney general determines that the civil action arose as a result
 of an act that was within the scope of the teacher's duties and that
 the teacher acted in good faith.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 22, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 22.0518 to read as follows:
 Sec. 22.0518.  DEFENSE BY ATTORNEY GENERAL. (a)  The
 attorney general shall defend a civil action brought against a
 teacher employed by a school district or open-enrollment charter
 school if the attorney general determines that:
 (1)  the civil action arose as a result of an act that
 was within the scope of the teacher's duties;
 (2)  the teacher acted in good faith; and
 (3)  representation of the teacher would not be a
 conflict of interest.
 (b)  Subsection (a) applies regardless of whether at the time
 the civil action is filed the teacher has terminated service with
 the school district or open-enrollment charter school.
 (c)  A determination made by the attorney general under
 Subsection (a) may not be admitted as evidence in a civil court
 proceeding.
 (d)  Nothing in this section may be construed to:
 (1)  deprive a teacher of the teacher's right to select
 legal counsel of the teacher's choosing at the teacher's own
 expense; or
 (2)  require the teacher to accept the attorney
 general's offer to represent the teacher.
 SECTION 3.  Section 22.0518, Education Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to actions brought on or after the effective
 date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *