Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB317 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/04/2019

                    By: Hughes, Flores, Perry S.B. No. 317
 (In the Senate - Filed January 7, 2019; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water & Rural Affairs;
 April 4, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; April 4, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 317 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the taking of feral hogs without a hunting license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 42.002(c), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  A resident landowner or any person, with the consent of
 the landowner, [the landowner's agent or lessee] may take feral
 hogs [causing depredation] on the resident landowner's land without
 having acquired a hunting license.
 SECTION 2.  Section 42.005(f), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (f)  A nonresident landowner or any person, with the consent
 of the landowner, [the landowner's agent or lessee] may take feral
 hogs [causing depredation] on the nonresident landowner's land
 without having acquired a hunting license required by this chapter.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *