Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB345 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/25/2019

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 345
 (In the Senate - Filed January 11, 2019; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 March 25, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 25, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 345 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of land in the William Goodrich Jones State
 Forest.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 88, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 88.1085 to read as follows:
 Sec. 88.1085.  USE OF LAND IN WILLIAM GOODRICH JONES STATE
 FOREST. (a)  For the purpose of this section, the "Jones State
 Forest" means the real property owned by the state for the use and
 benefit of The Texas A&M University System to demonstrate
 reforestation work and forest management work under the Texas A&M
 Forest Service, consisting of approximately 1,722 acres in
 Montgomery County, and formally dedicated and named the William
 Goodrich Jones State Forest.
 (b)  The entire territory of the Jones State Forest must
 remain natural, scenic, undeveloped, and open in a manner that
 maintains the tree canopy cover of the forest. No statute, rule,
 policy, or ordinance may be enforced with respect to the territory
 of the Jones State Forest, other than a statute, rule, policy, or
 ordinance that protects and conserves the natural resources, air
 quality, or water quality of the Jones State Forest.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *