Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB364 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/02/2019

                    By: Watson S.B. No. 364
 (In the Senate - Filed January 16, 2019; February 7, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Education;
 April 2, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 11, Nays 0; April 2, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 364 By:  Watson


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to policies on the recess period in public schools.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.004(l), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (l)  The local school health advisory council shall consider
 and make policy recommendations to the district concerning the
 importance of daily recess for elementary school students.  The
 council must consider research regarding unstructured and
 undirected play, academic and social development, and the health
 benefits of daily recess and the model recess policies developed by
 the Department of State Health Services School Health Advisory
 Committee under Section 28.0047, in making the recommendations.
 The council shall ensure that local community values are reflected
 in any policy recommendation made to the district under this
 subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter A, Chapter 28, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 28.0047 and 28.0048 to read as follows:
 Sec. 28.0047.  MODEL RECESS POLICIES. The Department of
 State Health Services School Health Advisory Committee established
 under Section 1001.0711, Health and Safety Code, shall develop
 model policies for the recess period during the school day. The
 model policies must include guidelines for:
 (1)  the number of minutes of weekly unstructured
 playtime; and
 (2)  whether a student's recess time may be withheld as
 a form of student discipline.
 Sec. 28.0048.  RECESS POLICY. (a)  The board of trustees of
 each school district shall:
 (1)  after reviewing the model recess policies
 developed under Section 28.0047 and the policy recommendations of
 the local school health advisory council provided under Section
 28.004(l), adopt a recess policy; and
 (2)  review and, if necessary, revise the recess policy
 at least every five years.
 (b)  The recess policy must specify:
 (1)  the required number of minutes of weekly
 unstructured playtime; and
 (2)  whether a student's recess time may be withheld as
 a form of student discipline.
 (c)  Each school district campus subject to the district
 recess policy adopted under Subsection (a) shall implement the
 recess policy.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  Not later than January 1, 2020, the
 Department of State Health Services School Health Advisory
 Committee shall develop model recess policies as required by
 Section 28.0047, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Not later than May 1, 2020, the board of trustees of each
 school district shall adopt a recess policy as required by Section
 28.0048, Education Code, as added by this Act.
 (c)  Not later than the beginning of the 2020-2021 school
 year, each school district campus subject to a school district
 recess policy adopted under Section 28.0048, Education Code, as
 added by this Act, shall implement the adopted policy.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *