Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB384 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/22/2019

                    S.B. No. 384


 AN ACT
 relating to the reporting of health care-associated infections and
 preventable adverse events at health care facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 98.103, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A health care facility[, other than a pediatric and
 adolescent hospital,] shall report to the department each health
 care-associated infection [the incidence of surgical site
 infections], including the causative pathogen if the infection is
 laboratory-confirmed, that occurs [occurring] in the facility and
 that the federal Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
 requires a facility participating in the Medicare program to report
 through the federal Centers for Disease Control and Prevention's
 National Healthcare Safety Network, or its successor [following
 procedures:
 [(1)  colon surgeries;
 [(2)  hip arthroplasties;
 [(3)  knee arthroplasties;
 [(4)  abdominal hysterectomies;
 [(5)  vaginal hysterectomies;
 [(6)  coronary artery bypass grafts; and
 [(7)  vascular procedures].
 (a-1)  A health care facility shall report each health
 care-associated infection to the department under this section
 regardless of the facility's participation in Medicare.
 SECTION 2.  The following provisions of the Health and
 Safety Code are repealed:
 (1)  Section 98.001(10);
 (2)  Sections 98.103(b) and (c); and
 (3)  Section 98.105.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  The executive commissioner of the Health
 and Human Services Commission shall adopt rules as necessary to
 implement Section 98.103, Health and Safety Code, as amended by
 this Act, not later than January 1, 2020.
 (b)  Section 98.103, Health and Safety Code, as amended by
 this Act, applies only to a report for a health care-associated
 infection occurring on or after January 1, 2020.  A report for a
 health care-associated infection occurring before that date is
 governed by the law as it existed on the date the infection
 occurred, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  The Health and Human Services Commission is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the commission may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 384 passed the Senate on
 April 10, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 30, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 384 passed the House on
 May 22, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 138, Nays 6,
 two present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor