Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB416 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/06/2019

                    By: Huffman S.B. No. 416
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 6, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 6, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to legal counsel provided by the attorney general to a
 political subdivision subject to a declared state of disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter H, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 418.193 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.193.  ATTORNEY GENERAL AS LEGAL ADVISOR ON ISSUES
 RELATED TO DECLARED DISASTER.  (a)  This section applies only
 during a declared state of disaster under Section 418.014 and the
 90-day period following the expiration or termination of the
 disaster declaration.
 (b)  The attorney general may provide legal counsel to a
 political subdivision subject to a declared state of disaster under
 Section 418.014 on issues related to disaster mitigation,
 preparedness, response, and recovery applicable to the area subject
 to the disaster declaration.
 (c)  A request for counsel under this section may be
 submitted only by:
 (1)  the emergency management director designated
 under Section 418.1015 for the political subdivision;
 (2)  the county judge or a commissioner of a county
 subject to the declaration; or
 (3)  the mayor of a municipality subject to the
 declaration.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *