Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB420 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/13/2019

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 420
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; March 13, 2019, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 13, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to dispenser requirements for refilling prescriptions for
 certain controlled substances.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 481.0765, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  A dispenser is not subject to the requirements of
 Section 481.0764(a) if the dispenser is refilling a prescription.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *