Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB429 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 429
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 24, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 24, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 429 By:  Perry


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a comprehensive plan for increasing and improving the
 workforce in this state to serve persons with mental health and
 substance use issues.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.02253 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.02253.  COMPREHENSIVE WORKFORCE PLAN FOR MENTAL
 HEALTH AND SUBSTANCE USE. (a) The statewide behavioral health
 coordinating council, under the direction of the commission, shall
 develop and the commission shall implement a comprehensive plan to
 increase and improve the workforce in this state to serve persons
 with mental health and substance use issues. In developing the
 plan, the council shall analyze and consider available studies,
 reports, and recommendations regarding that segment of the
 workforce in this state or elsewhere.
 (b)  The plan must include:
 (1)  a strategy and timeline for implementing the plan,
 including short-term, medium-term, and long-term goals;
 (2)  a system for monitoring the implementation of the
 plan; and
 (3)  a method for evaluating the outcomes of the plan.
 SECTION 2.  Not later than September 1, 2020, the statewide
 behavioral health coordinating council shall develop and the Health
 and Human Services Commission shall begin implementing the plan
 required under Section 531.02253, Government Code, as added by this
 Act.
 SECTION 3.  The statewide behavioral health coordinating
 council and the Health and Human Services Commission are required
 to implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money to the commission specifically for that purpose.
 If the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the council and the commission may, but are not required
 to, implement the provision using other appropriations made to the
 commission that are available for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *