Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB430 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2019

                    By: Lucio S.B. No. 430
 (In the Senate - Filed January 23, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Administration;
 April 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to designating June 13 as Blue Tie Day.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 662, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 662.071 to read as follows:
 Sec. 662.071.  BLUE TIE DAY. (a)  June 13 is Blue Tie Day to
 promote men's health awareness and encourage men to live healthier,
 longer lives through early detection and treatment of common
 diseases.
 (b)  Blue Tie Day shall be regularly observed by appropriate
 ceremonies and activities.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *