Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB449 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/14/2019

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 449
 (In the Senate - Filed January 24, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Property Tax;
 March 14, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; March 14, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to testimony by an appraisal district employee as to the
 value of real property in certain ad valorem tax appeals.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 9, Chapter 481 (S.B. 1760), Acts of the
 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, which added Section
 42.23(i), Tax Code, effective January 1, 2020, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *