Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB489 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/11/2019

                    By: Zaffirini S.B. No. 489
 (In the Senate - Filed January 28, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 11, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 11, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 489 By:  Zaffirini


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to personal information that may be omitted from certain
 records, licenses, and reports and to other court security
 measures.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 254, Election Code, is
 amended by adding Section 254.0313 to read as follows:
 Sec. 254.0313.  OMISSION OF ADDRESS FOR JUDGE AND SPOUSE.
 (a)  In this section, "federal judge" and "state judge" have the
 meanings assigned by Section 13.0021.
 (b)  On receiving notice from the Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System of a judge's
 qualification for office or on receipt of a written request from a
 federal judge, state judge, or spouse of a federal or state judge,
 the commission shall remove or redact the residence address of a
 federal judge, a state judge, or the spouse of a federal or state
 judge from any report filed by the judge in the judge's capacity or
 made available on the Internet under this chapter.
 SECTION 2.  Section 72.015, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d) to read as follows:
 (d)  The director of security and emergency preparedness
 shall annually submit to the legislature:
 (1)  a report on court security activities throughout
 the state supported by the judicial security division, including:
 (A)  the technical aspects of providing court
 security;
 (B)  court security training provided or required
 by the judicial security division;
 (C)  sufficiency of judicial security division
 resources to evaluate and monitor court security; and
 (D)  the adequacy of funding to maintain court
 security; and
 (2)  recommendations for:
 (A)  monitoring the use of state resources in
 providing court security;
 (B)  improving court security; and
 (C)  increasing the amount of state funds and
 other resources made available for court security.
 SECTION 3.  Section 11.008(a), Property Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  In this section, "instrument" means a deed, [or] deed of
 trust, or any other record recorded by a county clerk related to
 real property, including a mineral lease, a mechanic's lien, and
 the release of a mechanic's lien.
 SECTION 4.  Section 25.025(b), Tax Code, is amended to read
 as follows:
 (b)  Information in appraisal records under Section 25.02 is
 confidential and is available only for the official use of the
 appraisal district, this state, the comptroller, and taxing units
 and political subdivisions of this state if:
 (1)  the information identifies the home address of a
 named individual to whom this section applies; and
 (2)  the individual:
 (A)  chooses to restrict public access to the
 information on the form prescribed for that purpose by the
 comptroller under Section 5.07; or
 (B)  is a federal or state judge [as defined by
 Section 572.002, Government Code], or the spouse of a federal or
 state judge, beginning on the date the Office of Court
 Administration of the Texas Judicial System notifies the appraisal
 district of the judge's qualification for the judge's office.
 SECTION 5.  Section 521.121(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  The department shall establish a procedure, on a license
 holder's qualification for office as a federal or state judge as
 defined by Section 13.0021, Election Code [572.002, Government
 Code], to omit the residence address of the judge and the spouse of
 the judge on the license holder's license and to include, in lieu of
 that address, the street address of the courthouse in which the
 license holder or license holder's spouse serves as a federal judge
 or state judge.
 SECTION 6.  Section 254.0313, Election Code, as added by
 this Act, applies only to a report filed by a federal judge or state
 judge on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 7.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *