Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB504 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    By: Seliger S.B. No. 504
 (In the Senate - Filed January 29, 2019; February 14, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Higher Education;
 April 24, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 24, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the inclusion of certain information in postsecondary
 education and career counseling academies developed for certain
 school counselors and other postsecondary advisors employed by a
 school district.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 33.009, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  An academy developed under this section may include
 information regarding social-emotional learning and indicators of
 behavioral issues.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *