Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB531 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Birdwell S.B. No. 531
 (In the Senate - Filed January 30, 2019; February 21, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Natural Resources &
 Economic Development; April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with
 favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 531 By:  Birdwell


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to sources of funding for the Texas emissions reduction
 plan.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 151.0515(d), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  This section expires August 31, 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 2.  Section 152.0215(c), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  This section expires August 31, 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 3.  Section 501.138(b-3), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b-3)  This subsection and Subsection (b-2) expire August
 31, 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 4.  Section 502.358(c), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (c)  This section expires August 31, 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 5.  The heading to Section 548.5055, Transportation
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 548.5055.  TEXAS EMISSIONS [EMISSION] REDUCTION PLAN
 FEE.
 SECTION 6.  Sections 548.5055(b) and (c), Transportation
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The department shall remit fees collected under this
 section to the comptroller at the time and in the manner prescribed
 by the comptroller for deposit in the Texas emissions [emission]
 reduction plan fund.
 (c)  This section expires August 31, 2021 [2019].
 SECTION 7.  Sections 8(a-2) and (b), Chapter 755 (S.B.
 1731), Acts of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, are
 repealed.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect August 30, 2019.
 * * * * *