Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB533 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    S.B. No. 533


 AN ACT
 relating to the severance tax exemption for oil and gas produced
 from certain inactive wells.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 202.056(a)(4), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (4)  "Two-year inactive well" means a well that has not
 produced oil or gas in more than one month in the two years
 preceding the date of application for severance tax exemption under
 this section. The term does not include a well that is:
 (A)  part of an enhanced oil recovery project, as
 defined by Section 89.002, Natural Resources Code; or
 (B)  drilled but not completed and that does not
 have a record of hydrocarbon production reported to the commission.
 SECTION 2.  Section 202.056, Tax Code, is amended by
 amending Subsections (b), (c), (d), (e), (h), and (i) and adding
 Subsections (j) and (k) to read as follows:
 (b)  Hydrocarbons produced from a well qualify for a
 five-year [10-year] severance tax exemption if the commission
 designates the well as a [three-year inactive well or a] two-year
 inactive well.  The commission may require an applicant to provide
 the commission with any relevant information required to administer
 this section. The commission may require additional well tests to
 determine well capability as the commission [it] deems necessary.
 The commission shall notify the comptroller in writing immediately
 if the commission [it] determines that the operation of the
 [three-year inactive well or] two-year inactive well has been
 terminated or if the commission [it] discovers any information that
 affects the taxation of the production from the designated well.
 (c)  [If the commission designates a three-year inactive
 well under this section, it shall issue a certificate designating
 the well as a three-year inactive well as defined by Subsection
 (a)(3) of this section. The commission may not designate a
 three-year inactive well under this section after February 29,
 1996.] If the commission designates a two-year inactive well under
 this section, the commission [it] shall issue a certificate
 designating the well as a two-year inactive well [as defined by
 Subsection (a)(4) of this section. The commission may not
 designate a two-year inactive well under this section after
 February 28, 2010].
 (d)  [An application for three-year inactive well
 certification shall be made during the period of September 1, 1993,
 through August 31, 1995, to qualify for the tax exemption under this
 section.] An application for two-year inactive well certification
 must be made to the commission [shall be made during the period
 September 1, 1997, through August 31, 2009,] to qualify for the tax
 exemption under this section. Hydrocarbons sold after the date of
 certification are eligible for the tax exemption.
 (e)  The commission may revoke a certificate if information
 indicates that a certified well was not a [three-year inactive well
 or a] two-year inactive well[, as appropriate,] or if other lease
 production is credited to the certified well. Upon notice to the
 operator from the commission that the certificate for tax exemption
 under this section has been revoked, the tax exemption may not be
 applied to hydrocarbons sold from that well from the date of
 revocation.
 (h)  If the tax is paid at the full rate provided by Section
 201.052(a) or[, 201.052(b),] 202.052(a)[, or 202.052(b)] before
 the comptroller approves an application for an exemption provided
 for in this chapter, the operator is entitled to a credit against
 taxes imposed by this chapter in an amount equal to the tax paid. To
 receive a credit, the operator must apply to the comptroller for the
 credit before the expiration of the applicable period for filing a
 tax refund claim under Section 111.104.
 (i)  A [Penalties
 [(1)  Any] person who makes or subscribes any
 application, report, or other document and submits the application,
 report, or other document [it] to the commission to form the basis
 for an application for a tax exemption under this section, knowing
 that the application, report, or other document is false or untrue
 in a material fact, may be subject to the penalties imposed by
 Chapters 85 and 91, Natural Resources Code.
 (j)  On [(2)  Upon] notice from the commission that the
 certification for a [three-year inactive well or a] two-year
 inactive well has been revoked, the tax exemption shall not apply to
 oil or gas production sold after the date of notification. A [Any]
 person who violates this subsection is liable to the state for a
 civil penalty if the person applies or attempts to apply the tax
 exemption allowed by this chapter after the certification for a
 [three-year inactive well or a] two-year inactive well is revoked.
 The amount of the penalty may not exceed the sum of:
 (1) [(A)]  $10,000; and
 (2) [(B)]  the difference between the amount of taxes
 paid or attempted to be paid and the amount of taxes due.
 (k) [(3)]  The attorney general may recover a penalty under
 Subsection (j) [Subdivision (2) of this subsection] in a suit
 brought on behalf of the state. Venue for the suit is in Travis
 County.
 SECTION 3.  Section 202.056(a)(3), Tax Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 an oil or gas well designated by the Railroad Commission of Texas as
 a two-year inactive well on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An oil or gas well designated by the Railroad Commission of Texas as
 a two-year inactive well, or as a three-year inactive well, before
 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
 immediately before that date, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 533 passed the Senate on
 March 27, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.B. No. 533 passed the House on
 April 24, 2019, by the following vote:  Yeas 134, Nays 0, two
 present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Approved:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Governor