Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB560 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 560
 (In the Senate - Filed January 31, 2019; February 21, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human
 Services; April 24, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0;
 April 24, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 560 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a plan and report on court-ordered representation for
 certain suits affecting the parent-child relationship.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 71, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 71.0355 to read as follows:
 Sec. 71.0355.  PLAN AND REPORT ON COURT-ORDERED
 REPRESENTATION.  (a)  The council shall develop a statewide plan
 requiring counties and courts in this state to report information
 on court-ordered representation for appointments made in suits
 affecting the parent-child relationship under Part 1, Subchapter B,
 Chapter 107, Family Code.  In developing the plan, the council must
 consider the costs to counties of implementing the plan and design
 the plan to reduce redundant reporting.
 (b)  Not later than November 1 of each odd-numbered year and
 in the form and manner prescribed in the plan, each local
 administrative district judge for a court subject to the plan, or
 the person designated by the judge, shall prepare and provide to the
 council:
 (1)  a copy of all formal and informal rules and forms
 the court uses to appoint representation in suits affecting the
 parent-child relationship under Part 1, Subchapter B, Chapter 107,
 Family Code; and
 (2)  any fee schedule the court uses for court-ordered
 representation.
 (c)  Each county auditor, or other individual designated by
 the commissioners court of a county, shall prepare and send to the
 council, in the form and manner prescribed in the plan, information
 on the money spent by the county during the preceding state fiscal
 year to provide court-ordered representation in suits affecting the
 parent-child relationship under Part 1, Subchapter B, Chapter 107,
 Family Code.  The information must include:
 (1)  the total amount of money spent by the county to
 provide court-ordered representation services; and
 (2)  of the money spent under Subdivision (1), the
 amount of money spent:
 (A)  for appointments in each district court,
 county court, statutory county court, and appellate court in the
 county;
 (B)  for appointments of private attorneys for
 respondents, including parents, children, and alleged fathers, who
 are indigent;
 (C)  for appointments of public counsel for
 respondents, including parents, children, and alleged fathers, who
 are indigent; and
 (D)  for investigation, expert witness, or other
 litigation expenses.
 (d)  Each local administrative district judge for a court
 subject to the plan, or the person designated by the judge, and each
 county auditor, or other individual designated by the commissioners
 court of a county, shall provide to the council the information
 required under the plan and this section.
 (e)  The council annually shall:
 (1)  compile in a report the information submitted to
 the council under the plan and this section;
 (2)  submit the report compiled under Subdivision (1)
 to the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the house of
 representatives; and
 (3)  electronically publish the report compiled under
 Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 2.  (a)  As soon as practicable after the effective
 date of this Act, the Texas Judicial Council shall develop the plan
 required by Section 71.0355, Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b)  Notwithstanding Section 71.0355, Government Code, as
 added by this Act, a county or court in this state is not required to
 comply with that section until September 1, 2020, or a later date
 provided in the plan developed under that section.
 SECTION 3.  The Texas Judicial Council is required to
 implement a provision of this Act only if the legislature
 appropriates money specifically for that purpose.  If the
 legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the council may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *