Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB579 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 579
 (In the Senate - Filed February 1, 2019; February 21, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Property Tax;
 April 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 4,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation of certain
 property owned by the TexAmericas Center.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter D, Chapter 3503, Special District
 Local Laws Code, is amended by adding Section 3503.1541 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 3503.1541.  CERTAIN PROPERTY EXEMPT FROM TAXATION.
 (a)  A leasehold or other possessory interest granted to a person
 by the authority or by a nonprofit corporation holding title for the
 authority is owned, used, and held for a public purpose for and on
 behalf of the authority and is exempt from taxation under Section
 11.11, Tax Code.
 (b)  Section 25.07(a), Tax Code, does not apply to a
 leasehold or other possessory interest granted to a person by the
 authority or by a nonprofit corporation holding title for the
 authority during the period the authority or nonprofit corporation
 owns the estate or interest encumbered by the possessory interest.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies only to an ad valorem tax year
 that begins on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2020.
 * * * * *