Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB594 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/04/2019

                    86R8897 YDB-D
 By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 594


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a business advisory council on disaster
 recovery and mitigation.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 31, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 31.069 to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.069.  BUSINESS ADVISORY COUNCIL ON DISASTER RECOVERY
 AND MITIGATION. (a) In this section:
 (1)  "Advisory council" means the business advisory
 council on disaster recovery and mitigation established under this
 section.
 (2)  "Disaster" has the meaning assigned by Section
 418.004, Government Code.
 (b)  The business advisory council on disaster recovery and
 mitigation is established to provide to the commissioner advice and
 expertise on disaster recovery and mitigation as described by
 Subsection (g).
 (c)  The advisory council is composed of six representatives
 appointed by the commissioner as follows:
 (1)  one member representing banking and insurance
 entities in this state that provide mortgage lending and insurance
 for homeowners and businesses;
 (2)  one member representing construction entities in
 this state engaged in the construction of commercial, industrial,
 and residential buildings;
 (3)  one member representing the manufacturers in this
 state that produce construction materials;
 (4)  one member representing the oil and gas refiners
 and processing industries having major industrial infrastructure
 in areas of this state adjacent to the Gulf of Mexico that are most
 vulnerable to damage from hurricanes and flooding;
 (5)  one member representing the tourist and
 hospitality industry in areas of this state adjacent to the Gulf of
 Mexico that are most vulnerable to damage from hurricanes and
 flooding; and
 (6)  one member representing small businesses in this
 state that would be affected following a disaster by loss of
 customers, lost employees, and limited insurance.
 (d)  Members of the advisory council serve staggered
 four-year terms.
 (e)  An advisory council member is not entitled to
 compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses
 incurred by the member while conducting the business of the
 advisory council.
 (f)  The advisory council members shall elect a presiding
 officer from among the members.
 (g)  The advisory council shall:
 (1)  provide advice on disaster recovery mitigation and
 resilience, specifically related to housing;
 (2)  provide information on advanced technological
 systems for disaster construction engineering and other innovative
 solutions for addressing infrastructure risks;
 (3)  provide information on banking and insurance
 requirements imposed following a disaster that may affect housing
 construction and recovery in areas affected by the disaster;
 (4)  provide advice during disaster recovery on issues
 faced by state and local governments; and
 (5)  propose solutions to address inefficiencies or
 problems in the state or local governmental disaster response with
 respect to issues described by this subsection.
 (h)  The advisory council shall meet at the times and
 locations determined by the presiding officer, not to exceed four
 meetings each year.
 (i)  Not later than November 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the advisory council shall submit a report on the advisory
 council's activities, advice, and proposed solutions to the
 commissioner, the Texas Division of Emergency Management, the
 governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of the house of
 representatives.
 (j)  The land office shall provide administrative support to
 the advisory council.
 (k)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 advisory council.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the commissioner of the General Land Office shall
 appoint to the business advisory council on disaster recovery and
 mitigation two members to terms expiring February 1, 2021, two
 members to terms expiring February 1, 2022, and two members to
 terms expiring February 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.