Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB597 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/15/2019

                    By: Buckingham S.B. No. 597
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2019; February 21, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Property Tax;
 April 15, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5,
 Nays 0; April 15, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a prohibition on the imposition by an appraisal
 district or the appraisal review board for an appraisal district of
 a fee in connection with a protest filed with the board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 41.41, Tax Code, is amended by adding
 Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  An appraisal district or the appraisal review board for
 an appraisal district may not require a property owner to pay a fee
 in connection with a protest filed by the owner with the board.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *