By: Kolkhorst, et al. S.B. No. 6 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 7, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Water & Rural Affairs; March 14, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 14, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 6 By: Kolkhorst A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to emergency and disaster management, response, and recovery. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 418.005, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows: (c-1) The training course provided under this section related to the emergency management responsibilities of officers of political subdivisions must include training based on the disaster response guide as required by Section 418.054(b). SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by adding Sections 418.054, 418.055, 418.056, 418.057, and 418.058 to read as follows: Sec. 418.054. DISASTER RESPONSE GUIDE. (a) The division shall develop a model guide for local officials regarding disaster response and recovery. The guide must provide a comprehensive approach to disaster recovery by local officials and include information on: (1) contracting for debris removal; (2) obtaining federal disaster funding; (3) coordinating the availability and construction of short-term and long-term housing; and (4) obtaining assistance from local, state, and federal volunteer organizations. (b) The division, in coordination with the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service and the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service, shall provide training based on the disaster response guide as a part of the emergency management training course provided under Section 418.005. Sec. 418.055. CATASTROPHIC DEBRIS MANAGEMENT PLAN AND TRAINING. (a) The division, in consultation with the Emergency Management Council, the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service, the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service, the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, the Texas Department of Transportation, the comptroller, and political subdivisions, shall develop a catastrophic debris management plan and model guide for use by political subdivisions in the event of a disaster. (b) The plan must: (1) provide a guide for clearance and disposal of debris caused by a disaster; and (2) include: (A) provisions for the use of trench burners and air curtain incinerators of vegetative debris, including identifying sources of equipment for use immediately following a disaster; and (B) contracting standards and a model contract for use in procuring debris removal services following a disaster. (c) The division shall consult with the comptroller about including a contract for debris removal services on the schedule of multiple award contracts developed under Subchapter I, Chapter 2155, or in another cooperative purchasing program administered by the comptroller. (d) The Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service, in coordination with the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, shall establish a training program for state agencies and political subdivisions on the use of trench burners in debris removal. Sec. 418.056. DISASTER RECOVERY TASK FORCE. (a) The division shall develop a disaster recovery task force to operate throughout the long-term recovery period following natural and man-made disasters by providing specialized assistance for communities and individuals to address financial issues, available federal assistance programs, and recovery and resiliency planning to speed recovery efforts at the local level. (b) The disaster recovery task force may include and use the resources of: (1) The Texas A&M University System, including the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service, the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service, and the Texas A&M Forest Service; (2) other appropriate state agencies; and (3) organized volunteer groups. (c) The disaster recovery task force shall develop procedures for preparing and issuing a report listing each project related to a disaster that qualifies for federal assistance. A report must be submitted to the appropriate federal agencies as soon as practicable after any disaster. (d) Once each quarter, the disaster recovery task force shall brief members of the legislature, legislative staff, and state agency personnel on the response and recovery efforts for previous disasters and any preparation or planning for potential future hazards, threats, or disasters. Sec. 418.057. WET DEBRIS STUDY GROUP. (a) In this section, "study group" means the wet debris study group established under this section. (b) The wet debris study group is established and consists of the following members: (1) each member of the Emergency Management Council; (2) representatives from river authorities appointed by the governor; (3) environmental experts appointed by the governor; and (4) a representative from the Texas Historical Commission appointed by the governor. (c) The study group shall study issues related to preventing the creation of wet debris and best practices for clearing wet debris following a disaster, including: (1) the creation of maintenance programs for bodies of water in this state; (2) issues related to the clearance of wet debris on private property following a disaster; and (3) potential sources of funding for the clearance of wet debris following a disaster. (d) Not later than November 1, 2020, the study group shall submit a report containing recommendations on the issues described by Subsection (c) to each member of the legislature. (e) The study group is abolished and this section expires January 1, 2021. Sec. 418.058. EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT WORK GROUP. (a) In this section: (1) "Emergency management director" and "emergency management coordinator" mean the director and coordinator, respectively, designated under Section 418.1015. (2) "Work group" means the work group established under this section. (b) The division shall establish a work group of persons knowledgeable on emergency management to study and develop a proposal for enhancing the training and credentialing of emergency management directors and emergency management coordinators. (c) As part of the study and proposal under Subsection (b), the work group shall: (1) assess the training and credentials necessary for emergency management directors and emergency management coordinators to effectively oversee the response to and recovery from a disaster; and (2) consult with institutions of higher education as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, on the development of degree programs in emergency management in addition to the programs that exist in this state on September 1, 2019. (d) In conducting the assessment required by Subsection (c)(1), the work group shall consider: (1) whether the differences in geography, population, and critical infrastructure between emergency management directors' or emergency management coordinators' jurisdictions warrant different levels of training and credentialing; (2) whether the legislature should enact laws requiring an emergency management director or emergency management coordinator to participate in emergency management training and credentialing before overseeing the response to and recovery from a disaster; (3) whether to implement incentives for emergency management directors, emergency management coordinators, and any other emergency management personnel to complete additional training and continuing education; and (4) proposals for paying the cost for training for emergency management directors and emergency management coordinators that is more rigorous than the training required by law for the directors and coordinators on September 1, 2019. (e) Not later than November 1, 2020, the work group shall submit the proposal required under this section to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and members of the legislature. (f) The work group is abolished and this section expires January 1, 2021. SECTION 3. Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas Division of Emergency Management shall develop the catastrophic debris management plan and model guide required by Section 418.055, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *