Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB6 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/14/2019

                    By: Kolkhorst, et al. S.B. No. 6
 (In the Senate - Filed March 6, 2019; March 7, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Water & Rural Affairs;
 March 14, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; March 14, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 6 By:  Kolkhorst


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to emergency and disaster management, response, and
 recovery.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 418.005, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  The training course provided under this section
 related to the emergency management responsibilities of officers of
 political subdivisions must include training based on the disaster
 response guide as required by Section 418.054(b).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 418.054, 418.055, 418.056, 418.057, and
 418.058 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.054.  DISASTER RESPONSE GUIDE. (a)  The division
 shall develop a model guide for local officials regarding disaster
 response and recovery.  The guide must provide a comprehensive
 approach to disaster recovery by local officials and include
 information on:
 (1)  contracting for debris removal;
 (2)  obtaining federal disaster funding;
 (3)  coordinating the availability and construction of
 short-term and long-term housing; and
 (4)  obtaining assistance from local, state, and
 federal volunteer organizations.
 (b)  The division, in coordination with the Texas A&M
 AgriLife Extension Service and the Texas A&M Engineering Extension
 Service, shall provide training based on the disaster response
 guide as a part of the emergency management training course
 provided under Section 418.005.
 Sec. 418.055.  CATASTROPHIC DEBRIS MANAGEMENT PLAN AND
 TRAINING. (a)  The division, in consultation with the Emergency
 Management Council, the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service, the
 Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service, the Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality, the Texas Department of Transportation, the
 comptroller, and political subdivisions, shall develop a
 catastrophic debris management plan and model guide for use by
 political subdivisions in the event of a disaster.
 (b)  The plan must:
 (1)   provide a guide for clearance and disposal of
 debris caused by a disaster; and
 (2)  include:
 (A)  provisions for the use of trench burners and
 air curtain incinerators of vegetative debris, including
 identifying sources of equipment for use immediately following a
 disaster; and
 (B)  contracting standards and a model contract
 for use in procuring debris removal services following a disaster.
 (c)  The division shall consult with the comptroller about
 including a contract for debris removal services on the schedule of
 multiple award contracts developed under Subchapter I, Chapter
 2155, or in another cooperative purchasing program administered by
 the comptroller.
 (d)  The Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service, in
 coordination with the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality,
 shall establish a training program for state agencies and political
 subdivisions on the use of trench burners in debris removal.
 Sec. 418.056.  DISASTER RECOVERY TASK FORCE. (a)  The
 division shall develop a disaster recovery task force to operate
 throughout the long-term recovery period following natural and
 man-made disasters by providing specialized assistance for
 communities and individuals to address financial issues, available
 federal assistance programs, and recovery and resiliency planning
 to speed recovery efforts at the local level.
 (b)  The disaster recovery task force may include and use the
 resources of:
 (1)  The Texas A&M University System, including the
 Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service, the Texas A&M Engineering
 Extension Service, and the Texas A&M Forest Service;
 (2)  other appropriate state agencies; and
 (3)  organized volunteer groups.
 (c)  The disaster recovery task force shall develop
 procedures for preparing and issuing a report listing each project
 related to a disaster that qualifies for federal assistance. A
 report must be submitted to the appropriate federal agencies as
 soon as practicable after any disaster.
 (d)  Once each quarter, the disaster recovery task force
 shall brief members of the legislature, legislative staff, and
 state agency personnel on the response and recovery efforts for
 previous disasters and any preparation or planning for potential
 future hazards, threats, or disasters.
 Sec. 418.057.  WET DEBRIS STUDY GROUP. (a)  In this
 section, "study group" means the wet debris study group established
 under this section.
 (b)  The wet debris study group is established and consists
 of the following members:
 (1)  each member of the Emergency Management Council;
 (2)  representatives from river authorities appointed
 by the governor;
 (3)  environmental experts appointed by the governor;
 and
 (4)  a representative from the Texas Historical
 Commission appointed by the governor.
 (c)  The study group shall study issues related to preventing
 the creation of wet debris and best practices for clearing wet
 debris following a disaster, including:
 (1)  the creation of maintenance programs for bodies of
 water in this state;
 (2)  issues related to the clearance of wet debris on
 private property following a disaster; and
 (3)  potential sources of funding for the clearance of
 wet debris following a disaster.
 (d)  Not later than November 1, 2020, the study group shall
 submit a report containing recommendations on the issues described
 by Subsection (c) to each member of the legislature.
 (e)  The study group is abolished and this section expires
 January 1, 2021.
 Sec. 418.058.  EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT WORK GROUP. (a)  In
 this section:
 (1)  "Emergency management director" and "emergency
 management coordinator" mean the director and coordinator,
 respectively, designated under Section 418.1015.
 (2)  "Work group" means the work group established
 under this section.
 (b)  The division shall establish a work group of persons
 knowledgeable on emergency management to study and develop a
 proposal for enhancing the training and credentialing of emergency
 management directors and emergency management coordinators.
 (c)  As part of the study and proposal under Subsection (b),
 the work group shall:
 (1)  assess the training and credentials necessary for
 emergency management directors and emergency management
 coordinators to effectively oversee the response to and recovery
 from a disaster; and
 (2)  consult with institutions of higher education as
 defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, on the development of
 degree programs in emergency management in addition to the programs
 that exist in this state on September 1, 2019.
 (d)  In conducting the assessment required by Subsection
 (c)(1), the work group shall consider:
 (1)  whether the differences in geography, population,
 and critical infrastructure between emergency management
 directors' or emergency management coordinators' jurisdictions
 warrant different levels of training and credentialing;
 (2)  whether the legislature should enact laws
 requiring an emergency management director or emergency management
 coordinator to participate in emergency management training and
 credentialing before overseeing the response to and recovery from a
 disaster;
 (3)  whether to implement incentives for emergency
 management directors, emergency management coordinators, and any
 other emergency management personnel to complete additional
 training and continuing education; and
 (4)  proposals for paying the cost for training for
 emergency management directors and emergency management
 coordinators that is more rigorous than the training required by
 law for the directors and coordinators on September 1, 2019.
 (e)  Not later than November 1, 2020, the work group shall
 submit the proposal required under this section to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and
 members of the legislature.
 (f)  The work group is abolished and this section expires
 January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
 Division of Emergency Management shall develop the catastrophic
 debris management plan and model guide required by Section 418.055,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *