86R32350 AAF-D By: Kolkhorst, et al. S.B. No. 6 (Morrison) Substitute the following for S.B. No. 6: No. A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to emergency and disaster management, response, and recovery. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 418.005, Government Code, is amended by adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows: (c-1) The training course provided under this section related to the emergency management responsibilities of officers of political subdivisions must include training based on the disaster response guide as required by Section 418.054(b). SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is amended by adding Sections 418.054, 418.055, 418.056, and 418.057 to read as follows: Sec. 418.054. DISASTER RESPONSE GUIDE. (a) The division shall develop a model guide for local officials regarding disaster response and recovery. The guide must provide a comprehensive approach to disaster recovery by local officials and include information on: (1) contracting for debris removal; (2) obtaining federal disaster funding; (3) coordinating the availability and construction of short-term and long-term housing; and (4) obtaining assistance from local, state, and federal volunteer organizations. (b) The division, in coordination with the Texas A&M AgriLife Extension Service and the Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service, shall provide training based on the disaster response guide as a part of the emergency management training course provided under Section 418.005. Sec. 418.055. CATASTROPHIC DEBRIS MANAGEMENT PLAN AND TRAINING. (a) The division, in consultation with any other state agencies selected by the division, shall develop a catastrophic debris management plan and model guide for use by political subdivisions in the event of a disaster. (b) The plan must: (1) provide a guide for clearance and disposal of debris caused by a disaster, including information on preparing for debris removal before a disaster; and (2) include: (A) provisions for the use of trench burners and air curtain incinerators of vegetative debris, including identifying sources of equipment for use immediately following a disaster; and (B) contracting standards and a model contract for use in procuring debris removal services following a disaster. (c) The division shall consult with the comptroller about including a contract for debris removal services on the schedule of multiple award contracts developed under Subchapter I, Chapter 2155, or in another cooperative purchasing program administered by the comptroller. (d) The Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service, in coordination with the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality, shall establish a training program for state agencies and political subdivisions on the use of trench burners in debris removal. Sec. 418.056. WET DEBRIS STUDY GROUP. (a) In this section, "study group" means the wet debris study group established under this section. (b) The wet debris study group is established and composed of representatives of the division, any other state agencies selected by the division, and local and federal governmental entities. (c) The chief of the division serves as chair of the study group. (d) The study group shall study issues related to preventing the creation of wet debris and best practices for clearing wet debris following a disaster, including: (1) the creation of maintenance programs for bodies of water in this state; (2) issues related to the clearance of wet debris on private property following a disaster; and (3) potential sources of funding for the clearance of wet debris following a disaster. (e) Not later than November 1, 2020, the study group shall submit a report containing recommendations on the issues described by Subsection (d) to each member of the legislature. (f) The study group is abolished and this section expires January 1, 2021. Sec. 418.057. EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT WORK GROUP. (a) In this section: (1) "Emergency management director" and "emergency management coordinator" mean the director and coordinator, respectively, designated under Section 418.1015. (2) "Work group" means the work group established under this section. (b) The division shall establish a work group of persons knowledgeable on emergency management to study and develop a proposal for enhancing the training and credentialing of emergency management directors, emergency management coordinators, and any other emergency management personnel. (c) As part of the study and proposal under Subsection (b), the work group shall: (1) assess the training and credentials necessary for emergency management directors, emergency management coordinators, and any other emergency management personnel to effectively oversee the response to and recovery from a disaster; (2) review training courses that are required for emergency management directors, emergency management coordinators, and any other emergency management personnel in this state on September 1, 2019; and (3) consult with institutions of higher education as defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, on the development of degree programs in emergency management in addition to the programs that exist in this state on September 1, 2019. (d) In conducting the assessment required by Subsection (c)(1), the work group shall consider: (1) whether the differences in geography, population, and critical infrastructure between emergency management directors' or emergency management coordinators' jurisdictions warrant different levels of training and credentialing; (2) whether the legislature should enact laws requiring an emergency management director or emergency management coordinator to participate in emergency management training and credentialing before overseeing the response to and recovery from a disaster; (3) whether to include in any recommended emergency management training under Subdivision (2) information on disaster finance, damage assessment, disaster contracting, debris management, and the skills needed to participate in federal emergency management programs; (4) whether to implement incentives for emergency management directors, emergency management coordinators, and any other emergency management personnel to complete additional training and continuing education; and (5) proposals for paying the cost for training for emergency management directors and emergency management coordinators that is more rigorous than the training required by law for the directors and coordinators on September 1, 2019. (e) Not later than November 1, 2020, the work group shall submit the proposal required under this section to the governor, lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and members of the legislature. (f) The work group is abolished and this section expires January 1, 2021. SECTION 3. (a) In this section: (1) "Commission" means the Health and Human Services Commission. (2) "Division" means the Texas Division of Emergency Management. (b) The commission and the division shall conduct a study to determine the feasibility of developing: (1) a single intake form that would compile all information needed to obtain disaster assistance from multiple state and federal programs for an individual who needs assistance as a result of a disaster; and (2) an automated intake system for collecting the information. (c) The commission and the division shall coordinate with the Federal Emergency Management Agency and other appropriate state and federal agencies to conduct the study under Subsection (b) of this section. The commission and the division must determine whether the Federal Emergency Management Agency and other appropriate state and federal agencies will accept the single intake form. (d) Not later than September 1, 2020, the commission and the division shall prepare and submit a written report to the legislature containing the findings of the study conducted under Subsection (b) of this section and any recommendations to the legislature. (e) This section expires January 1, 2021. SECTION 4. Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas Division of Emergency Management shall develop the catastrophic debris management plan and model guide required by Section 418.055, Government Code, as added by this Act. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.