Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB6 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/16/2019

                    86R32350 AAF-D
 By: Kolkhorst, et al. S.B. No. 6
 (Morrison)
 Substitute the following for S.B. No. 6:  No.


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to emergency and disaster management, response, and
 recovery.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 418.005, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (c-1) to read as follows:
 (c-1)  The training course provided under this section
 related to the emergency management responsibilities of officers of
 political subdivisions must include training based on the disaster
 response guide as required by Section 418.054(b).
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Sections 418.054, 418.055, 418.056, and 418.057
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.054.  DISASTER RESPONSE GUIDE. (a)  The division
 shall develop a model guide for local officials regarding disaster
 response and recovery.  The guide must provide a comprehensive
 approach to disaster recovery by local officials and include
 information on:
 (1)  contracting for debris removal;
 (2)  obtaining federal disaster funding;
 (3)  coordinating the availability and construction of
 short-term and long-term housing; and
 (4)  obtaining assistance from local, state, and
 federal volunteer organizations.
 (b)  The division, in coordination with the Texas A&M
 AgriLife Extension Service and the Texas A&M Engineering Extension
 Service, shall provide training based on the disaster response
 guide as a part of the emergency management training course
 provided under Section 418.005.
 Sec. 418.055.  CATASTROPHIC DEBRIS MANAGEMENT PLAN AND
 TRAINING. (a)  The division, in consultation with any other state
 agencies selected by the division, shall develop a catastrophic
 debris management plan and model guide for use by political
 subdivisions in the event of a disaster.
 (b)  The plan must:
 (1)   provide a guide for clearance and disposal of
 debris caused by a disaster, including information on preparing for
 debris removal before a disaster; and
 (2)  include:
 (A)  provisions for the use of trench burners and
 air curtain incinerators of vegetative debris, including
 identifying sources of equipment for use immediately following a
 disaster; and
 (B)  contracting standards and a model contract
 for use in procuring debris removal services following a disaster.
 (c)  The division shall consult with the comptroller about
 including a contract for debris removal services on the schedule of
 multiple award contracts developed under Subchapter I, Chapter
 2155, or in another cooperative purchasing program administered by
 the comptroller.
 (d)  The Texas A&M Engineering Extension Service, in
 coordination with the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality,
 shall establish a training program for state agencies and political
 subdivisions on the use of trench burners in debris removal.
 Sec. 418.056.  WET DEBRIS STUDY GROUP. (a)  In this
 section, "study group" means the wet debris study group established
 under this section.
 (b)  The wet debris study group is established and composed
 of representatives of the division, any other state agencies
 selected by the division, and local and federal governmental
 entities.
 (c)  The chief of the division serves as chair of the study
 group.
 (d)  The study group shall study issues related to preventing
 the creation of wet debris and best practices for clearing wet
 debris following a disaster, including:
 (1)  the creation of maintenance programs for bodies of
 water in this state;
 (2)  issues related to the clearance of wet debris on
 private property following a disaster; and
 (3)  potential sources of funding for the clearance of
 wet debris following a disaster.
 (e)  Not later than November 1, 2020, the study group shall
 submit a report containing recommendations on the issues described
 by Subsection (d) to each member of the legislature.
 (f)  The study group is abolished and this section expires
 January 1, 2021.
 Sec. 418.057.  EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT WORK GROUP. (a)  In
 this section:
 (1)  "Emergency management director" and "emergency
 management coordinator" mean the director and coordinator,
 respectively, designated under Section 418.1015.
 (2)  "Work group" means the work group established
 under this section.
 (b)  The division shall establish a work group of persons
 knowledgeable on emergency management to study and develop a
 proposal for enhancing the training and credentialing of emergency
 management directors, emergency management coordinators, and any
 other emergency management personnel.
 (c)  As part of the study and proposal under Subsection (b),
 the work group shall:
 (1)  assess the training and credentials necessary for
 emergency management directors, emergency management coordinators,
 and any other emergency management personnel to effectively oversee
 the response to and recovery from a disaster;
 (2)  review training courses that are required for
 emergency management directors, emergency management coordinators,
 and any other emergency management personnel in this state on
 September 1, 2019; and
 (3)  consult with institutions of higher education as
 defined by Section 61.003, Education Code, on the development of
 degree programs in emergency management in addition to the programs
 that exist in this state on September 1, 2019.
 (d)  In conducting the assessment required by Subsection
 (c)(1), the work group shall consider:
 (1)  whether the differences in geography, population,
 and critical infrastructure between emergency management
 directors' or emergency management coordinators' jurisdictions
 warrant different levels of training and credentialing;
 (2)  whether the legislature should enact laws
 requiring an emergency management director or emergency management
 coordinator to participate in emergency management training and
 credentialing before overseeing the response to and recovery from a
 disaster;
 (3)  whether to include in any recommended emergency
 management training under Subdivision (2) information on disaster
 finance, damage assessment, disaster contracting, debris
 management, and the skills needed to participate in federal
 emergency management programs;
 (4)  whether to implement incentives for emergency
 management directors, emergency management coordinators, and any
 other emergency management personnel to complete additional
 training and continuing education; and
 (5)  proposals for paying the cost for training for
 emergency management directors and emergency management
 coordinators that is more rigorous than the training required by
 law for the directors and coordinators on September 1, 2019.
 (e)  Not later than November 1, 2020, the work group shall
 submit the proposal required under this section to the governor,
 lieutenant governor, speaker of the house of representatives, and
 members of the legislature.
 (f)  The work group is abolished and this section expires
 January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Commission" means the Health and Human Services
 Commission.
 (2)  "Division" means the Texas Division of Emergency
 Management.
 (b)  The commission and the division shall conduct a study to
 determine the feasibility of developing:
 (1)  a single intake form that would compile all
 information needed to obtain disaster assistance from multiple
 state and federal programs for an individual who needs assistance
 as a result of a disaster; and
 (2)  an automated intake system for collecting the
 information.
 (c)  The commission and the division shall coordinate with
 the Federal Emergency Management Agency and other appropriate state
 and federal agencies to conduct the study under Subsection (b) of
 this section.  The commission and the division must determine
 whether the Federal Emergency Management Agency and other
 appropriate state and federal agencies will accept the single
 intake form.
 (d)  Not later than September 1, 2020, the commission and the
 division shall prepare and submit a written report to the
 legislature containing the findings of the study conducted under
 Subsection (b) of this section and any recommendations to the
 legislature.
 (e)  This section expires January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 4.  Not later than January 1, 2020, the Texas
 Division of Emergency Management shall develop the catastrophic
 debris management plan and model guide required by Section 418.055,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.