Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB633 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/18/2019

                    By: Kolkhorst, Perry S.B. No. 633
 (In the Senate - Filed February 4, 2019; March 1, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Health & Human Services;
 March 18, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; March 18, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 633 By:  Flores


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an initiative to increase the capacity of local mental
 health authorities to provide access to mental health services in
 certain counties.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 531.0221 to read as follows:
 Sec. 531.0221.  INITIATIVE TO INCREASE MENTAL HEALTH
 SERVICES CAPACITY IN RURAL AREAS. (a)  In this section, "local
 mental health authority group" means a group of local mental health
 authorities established under Subsection (b)(2).
 (b)  Not later than January 1, 2020, the commission, using
 existing resources, shall:
 (1)  identify each local mental health authority that
 is located in a county with a population of 250,000 or less or that
 the commission determines provides services predominantly in a
 county with a population of 250,000 or less;
 (2)  in a manner that the commission determines will
 best achieve the reductions described by Subsection (d), assign the
 authorities identified under Subdivision (1) to regional groups of
 at least two authorities; and
 (3)  notify each authority identified under
 Subdivision (1):
 (A)  that the commission has identified the
 authority under that subdivision; and
 (B)  which local mental health authority group the
 commission assigned the authority to under Subdivision (2).
 (c)  The commission, using existing resources, shall develop
 a mental health services development plan for each local mental
 health authority group that will increase the capacity of the
 authorities in the group to provide access to needed services,
 using existing resources of the authorities.
 (d)  In developing a plan under Subsection (c), the
 commission shall focus on reducing:
 (1)  the cost to local governments of providing
 services to persons experiencing a mental health crisis;
 (2)  the transportation of persons served by an
 authority in the local mental health authority group to mental
 health facilities;
 (3)  the incarceration of persons with mental illness
 in county jails that are located in an area served by an authority
 in the local mental health authority group; and
 (4)  the number of hospital emergency room visits by
 persons with mental illness at hospitals located in an area served
 by an authority in the local mental health authority group.
 (e)  In developing a plan under Subsection (c):
 (1)  the commission shall assess the capacity of the
 authorities in the local mental health authority group to provide
 access to needed services; and
 (2)  the commission and the local mental health
 authority group shall evaluate:
 (A)  whether and to what degree increasing the
 capacity of the authorities in the local mental health authority
 group to provide access to needed services would offset the cost to
 state or local governmental entities of:
 (i)  the transportation of persons for
 mental health services to facilities that are not local providers;
 (ii)  admissions to and inpatient
 hospitalizations at state hospitals or other treatment facilities;
 (iii)  the provision of services by hospital
 emergency rooms to persons with mental illness who are served by or
 reside in an area served by an authority in the local mental health
 authority group; and
 (iv)  the incarceration in county jails of
 persons with mental illness who are served by or reside in an area
 served by an authority in the local mental health authority group;
 (B)  whether available state funds or grant
 funding sources could be used to fund the plan; and
 (C)  what measures would be necessary to ensure
 that the plan aligns with the statewide behavioral health strategic
 plan and the comprehensive inpatient mental health plan.
 (f)  In each mental health services development plan
 produced under this section, the commission, in collaboration with
 the local mental health authority group, shall determine a method
 of increasing the capacity of the authorities in the local mental
 health authority group to provide access to needed services that
 uses existing resources of the authorities.
 (g)  The commission shall compile and evaluate each mental
 health services development plan produced under this section and
 determine:
 (1)  the cost-effectiveness of each plan; and
 (2)  how each plan would improve the delivery of mental
 health treatment and care to residents in the service areas of the
 authorities in the local mental health authority group.
 (h)  Not later than December 1, 2020, the commission, using
 existing resources, shall produce and publish on its Internet
 website a report containing:
 (1)  the commission's evaluation of each plan under
 Subsection (g);
 (2)  each mental health services development plan
 evaluated by the commission under Subsection (g); and
 (3)  a comprehensive statewide analysis of mental
 health services in counties with a population of 250,000 or less,
 including recommendations to the legislature for implementing the
 plans developed under this section.
 (i)  The commission and the authorities in each local mental
 health authority group may implement a mental health services
 development plan evaluated by the commission under this section if
 the commission and the local mental health authority group to which
 the plan applies identify a method of funding that implementation
 using existing resources.
 (j)  This section expires September 1, 2021.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *