Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB645 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/01/2019

                    By: Birdwell, et al. S.B. No. 645
 (In the Senate - Filed February 5, 2019; March 1, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 1, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 1, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to restrictions on holders of package store permits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 22.04 and 22.05, Alcoholic Beverage
 Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *