Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB653 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    By: Hall, et al. S.B. No. 653
 (In the Senate - Filed February 5, 2019; March 1, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 24, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 2; April 24, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 653 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to prohibiting the use of photographic traffic signal
 enforcement systems.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  The heading to Chapter 707, Transportation Code,
 is amended to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 707. PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNAL
 ENFORCEMENT SYSTEM PROHIBITED
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 707, Transportation Code, is amended by
 adding Sections 707.020 and 707.021 to read as follows:
 Sec. 707.020.  PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC SIGNAL ENFORCEMENT
 SYSTEM PROHIBITED. (a)  Notwithstanding any other law, a local
 authority may not implement or operate a photographic traffic
 signal enforcement system with respect to a highway or street under
 the jurisdiction of the authority.
 (b)  The attorney general shall enforce this section.
 Sec. 707.021.  USE OF EVIDENCE FROM PHOTOGRAPHIC TRAFFIC
 SIGNAL ENFORCEMENT SYSTEM PROHIBITED. Notwithstanding any other
 law, a local authority may not issue a civil or criminal charge or
 citation for an offense or violation based on a recorded image
 produced by a photographic traffic signal enforcement system.
 SECTION 3.  Section 27.031(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  In addition to the jurisdiction and powers provided by
 the constitution and other law, the justice court has original
 jurisdiction of:
 (1)  civil matters in which exclusive jurisdiction is
 not in the district or county court and in which the amount in
 controversy is not more than $10,000, exclusive of interest;
 (2)  cases of forcible entry and detainer; and
 (3)  foreclosure of mortgages and enforcement of liens
 on personal property in cases in which the amount in controversy is
 otherwise within the justice court's jurisdiction[; and
 [(4)     cases arising under Chapter 707, Transportation
 Code, outside a municipality's territorial limits].
 SECTION 4.  Section 780.003(b), Health and Safety Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The account is composed of money deposited to the credit
 of the account under the [Sections 542.406 and 707.008,]
 Transportation Code[,] and under Section 780.002 of this code.
 SECTION 5.  Section 133.004, Local Government Code, as
 amended by Chapters 718 (H.B. 2359), 1027 (H.B. 1623), and 1149
 (S.B. 1119), Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007,
 is reenacted and amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 133.004.  CIVIL FEES. This chapter applies to the
 following civil fees:
 (1)  the consolidated fee on filing in district court
 imposed under Section 133.151;
 (2)  the filing fee in district court for basic civil
 legal services for indigents imposed under Section 133.152;
 (3)  the filing fee in courts other than district court
 for basic civil legal services for indigents imposed under Section
 133.153;
 (4)  the filing fees for the judicial fund imposed in
 certain statutory county courts under Section 51.702, Government
 Code;
 (5)  the filing fees for the judicial fund imposed in
 certain county courts under Section 51.703, Government Code;
 (6)  the filing fees for the judicial fund imposed in
 statutory probate courts under Section 51.704, Government Code;
 (7)  fees collected under Section 118.015;
 (8)  marriage license fees for the family trust fund
 collected under Section 118.018;
 (9)  marriage license or declaration of informal
 marriage fees for the child abuse and neglect prevention trust fund
 account collected under Section 118.022; and
 (10)  the filing fee for the judicial fund imposed in
 district court, statutory county court, and county court under
 Section 133.154[; and
 [(11)     the portion of the civil or administrative
 penalty described by Section 542.406(c)(1), Transportation Code,
 imposed by a local authority to enforce compliance with the
 instructions of a traffic-control signal;
 [(11)     the portion of the civil or administrative
 penalty described by Section 707.008(a)(1), Transportation Code,
 imposed by a local authority to enforce compliance with the
 instructions of a traffic-control signal].
 SECTION 6.  The following are repealed:
 (1)  Section 29.003(g), Government Code;
 (2)  Sections 542.405, 542.406, and 544.012,
 Transportation Code; and
 (3)  Sections 707.001(2), 707.002, 707.0021, 707.003,
 707.004, 707.005, 707.006, 707.007, 707.008, 707.009, 707.010,
 707.011, 707.012, 707.013, 707.014, 707.015, 707.016, 707.017,
 707.018, and 707.019, Transportation Code.
 SECTION 7.  The Texas Department of Transportation is
 required to implement a provision of this Act only if the
 legislature appropriates money specifically for that purpose. If
 the legislature does not appropriate money specifically for that
 purpose, the department may, but is not required to, implement a
 provision of this Act using other appropriations available for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *