By: Huffman, Paxton S.B. No. 696 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2019; March 1, 2019, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal Justice; April 24, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 6, Nays 0; April 24, 2019, sent to printer.) Click here to see the committee vote A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to peace officer instruction on the trafficking of persons and compelling prostitution. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 1701.253, Occupations Code, is amended by adding Subsection (p) to read as follows: (p) As part of the minimum curriculum requirements, the commission shall require an officer to complete the basic education and training program on the trafficking of persons developed under Section 1701.258(a). An officer shall complete the program not later than the second anniversary of the date the officer is licensed under this chapter unless the officer completes the program as part of the officer's basic training course. SECTION 2. Section 1701.258(a), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The commission [by rule] shall require an officer [first licensed by the commission on or after January 1, 2011,] to complete [within a reasonable time after obtaining the license] a one-time basic education and training program on the trafficking of persons. The program must: (1) consist of at least four hours of training; and (2) include a review of the substance of Sections 20A.02 and 43.05, Penal Code. SECTION 3. Section 1701.402(j), Occupations Code, is amended to read as follows: (j) As a requirement for issuance of an intermediate or advanced proficiency certificate [issued by the commission on or after January 1, 2011], an officer must complete the advanced [basic] education, instruction, and training program on the trafficking of persons and compelling prostitution described by Section 1701.258(b) [1701.258(a)]. SECTION 4. Section 1701.402(j), Occupations Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to an intermediate or advanced proficiency certificate issued by the Texas Commission on Law Enforcement on or after the effective date of this Act. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2019. * * * * *