Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB702 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 03/18/2019

                    By: Bettencourt S.B. No. 702
 (In the Senate - Filed February 7, 2019; March 1, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 March 18, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; March 18, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authorization and reporting of expenditures for
 lobbying activities by certain political subdivisions and other
 public entities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 140, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Section 140.012 to read as follows:
 Sec. 140.012.  EXPENDITURES FOR LOBBYING ACTIVITIES.
 (a)  This section applies only to a:
 (1)  political subdivision that imposes a tax;
 (2)  political subdivision or special district that has
 the authority to issue bonds, including revenue bonds;
 (3)  regional mobility authority;
 (4)  transit authority;
 (5)  regional tollway authority;
 (6)  special purpose district;
 (7)  public institution of higher education;
 (8)  community college district;
 (9)  publicly owned utility; and
 (10)  river authority.
 (b)  A political subdivision or entity described by
 Subsection (a) may spend money to directly or indirectly influence
 or attempt to influence the outcome of any legislation pending
 before the legislature only if the expenditure is authorized by a
 majority vote of the governing body of the political subdivision or
 entity in an open meeting of the governing body.  The expenditure
 must be voted on by the governing body as a stand-alone item on the
 agenda at the meeting.
 (c)  A political subdivision or entity described by
 Subsection (a) shall report to the Texas Ethics Commission and
 publish on the political subdivision's or entity's Internet
 website:
 (1)  the amount of money authorized under Subsection
 (b) for the purpose of directly or indirectly influencing or
 attempting to influence the outcome of any legislation pending
 before the legislature;
 (2)  the name of any person required to register under
 Chapter 305, Government Code, retained or employed by the political
 subdivision or entity for the purpose described by Subdivision (1);
 and
 (3)  an electronic copy of any contract for services
 for the purpose described by Subdivision (1) that is entered into by
 the political subdivision or entity with each person listed under
 Subdivision (2).
 (d)  In addition to the requirements of Subsection (c), a
 political subdivision or entity described by Subsection (a) shall
 report to the Texas Ethics Commission and publish on the political
 subdivision's or entity's Internet website the amount of public
 money spent for membership fees and dues of any nonprofit state
 association or organization of similarly situated political
 subdivisions or entities that directly or indirectly influences or
 attempts to influence the outcome of any legislation pending before
 the legislature.
 (e)  The Texas Ethics Commission shall make available to the
 public a searchable database on the commission's Internet website
 containing the reports submitted to the commission under Subsection
 (c).
 (f)  If a political subdivision or entity described by
 Subsection (a) does not comply with the requirements of this
 section, an interested party is entitled to appropriate injunctive
 relief to prevent further activity in violation of this section.
 For purposes of this subsection, "interested party" means a person
 who:
 (1)  is a taxpayer of the political subdivision or
 entity described by Subsection (a); or
 (2)  is served by or receives services from the
 political subdivision or entity described by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *