Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB711 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/23/2019

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 711
 (In the Senate - Filed February 8, 2019; March 1, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 23, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 23, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 711 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to allowing safety recall information to be included in a
 vehicle inspection report.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 382.202, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by adding Subsection (d-1) to read as follows:
 (d-1)  The commission may adopt rules providing for the
 inclusion on a vehicle inspection report for a vehicle inspected in
 a county that is included in a vehicle emissions inspection and
 maintenance program under Subchapter F, Chapter 548,
 Transportation Code, of notification regarding whether the vehicle
 is subject to a safety recall for which the vehicle has not been
 repaired or the repairs are incomplete.  The commission may accept
 gifts, grants, and donations from any source, including private and
 nonprofit organizations, for the purpose of providing the
 notification described by this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Section 548.252, Transportation Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  The department may adopt rules providing for the
 inclusion on a vehicle inspection report for a vehicle inspected
 under this chapter notification regarding whether the vehicle is
 subject to a safety recall for which the vehicle has not been
 repaired or the repairs are incomplete. The department may accept
 gifts, grants, and donations from any source, including private and
 nonprofit organizations, for the purpose of providing the
 notification described by this subsection.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *