Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB751 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 751
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2019; March 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a criminal offense for fabricating a
 deceptive video with intent to influence the outcome of an
 election.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 255.004, Election Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (d) and (e) to read as follows:
 (d)  A person commits an offense if the person, with intent
 to injure a candidate or influence the result of an election:
 (1)  creates a deep fake video; and
 (2)  causes the deep fake video to be published or
 distributed within 30 days of an election.
 (e)  In this section, "deep fake video" means a video created
 with artificial intelligence that, with the intent to deceive,
 appears to depict a real person performing an action that did not
 occur in reality.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *