Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB755 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/04/2019

                    By: Hinojosa S.B. No. 755
 (In the Senate - Filed February 11, 2019; March 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Transportation;
 April 4, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 4, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 755 By:  Hinojosa


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the administration, powers, and duties of certain
 navigation districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 62, Water Code, is amended
 by adding Section 62.0725 to read as follows:
 Sec. 62.0725.  EXECUTIVE DIRECTOR. (a)  The commission may
 employ an executive director of the district. If the commission
 employs an executive director, the commission must prescribe the
 duties and compensation of the executive director.
 (b)  By rule, order, or resolution, the commission may
 delegate to an executive director the full authority necessary to
 manage the affairs of the district subject only to orders of the
 commission, including the authority to:
 (1)  employ persons necessary for the operation of the
 district and to determine the compensation of those persons; or
 (2)  perform any act on behalf of the district, as
 authorized by the commission.
 (c)  The duties of an executive director may be performed by
 a general manager or chief executive officer.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 62.077, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 62.077.  [ASSISTANT ENGINEERS AND EMPLOYEES;]
 COUNSEL[; SALARIES AND FEES].
 SECTION 3.  Section 62.077(c), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The [amount of compensation for employees and] fees of
 counsel shall be determined by the commission.
 SECTION 4.  Section 62.113, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 62.113.  FORM OF CONTRACTS. All contracts made by the
 district [commission] shall be in writing and signed by the
 contractors [and at least two of the commissioners], the executive
 director of the district, [or] an authorized representative of the
 executive director, or a person to whom the duties of executive
 director have been delegated.
 SECTION 5.  The heading to Section 62.115, Water Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 62.115.  SUPERVISION OF WORK[; REPORT].
 SECTION 6.  Section 62.115(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  Unless done under the supervision of the United States,
 all work contracted for by the district [commission] shall be done
 under the supervision of a representative of the district
 [engineer].
 SECTION 7.  Sections 62.116(a) and (b), Water Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A representative of the district [The commission] shall
 inspect the progress of work being done under a contract, and on
 completion of the contract, the district's chief financial officer
 [commission] shall draw a warrant on the county treasurer or issue a
 check payable to the contractor or the contractor's [his] assignee
 for the amount of the contract price.  The warrant or check shall be
 paid out of the construction and maintenance fund or the operating
 fund of the district.
 (b)  If the district [commission] considers it advisable,
 the district [it] may contract for work to be paid for in partial
 payments as the work progresses.  [The partial payments may not
 exceed in the aggregate eighty percent of the total amount to be
 paid under the contract.]  The amount of work completed at the time
 of the partial payment shall be shown by a certificate of a
 representative of the district [engineer].
 SECTION 8.  Section 62.122(a), Water Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The [Except as provided by Subsection (b), the]
 commission may authorize the executive director to sell, destroy,
 donate, or otherwise dispose of the district's [periodically
 dispose of] surplus or salvage personal property by any method the
 executive director or the executive director's designee determines
 is in the best interest of the district [in the same manner as the
 commissioners court of a county under Subchapter D, Chapter 263,
 Local Government Code].
 SECTION 9.  Section 62.152, Water Code, is amended to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 62.152.  PAYMENT OF EXPENSES [WARRANTS].  The district
 [commission] may draw warrants or issue checks:
 (1)  to pay for [legal] services;
 (2)  to pay the compensation [salary] of [the engineer,
 his assistant, and any other] employees; and
 (3)  to pay all expenses incident to operation of the
 district.
 SECTION 10.  Section 62.153, Water Code, as amended by
 Chapters 398 (S.B. 1131) and 427 (S.B. 1395), Acts of the 85th
 Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, is reenacted and amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 62.153.  DUTIES OF DISTRICT TREASURER; AUTHORITY OF
 DESIGNATED OFFICER. (a)  The district treasurer shall:
 (1)  open an account for all funds received by the
 district treasurer for the district and all district funds which
 the treasurer pays out;
 (2)  pay out money on vouchers signed by the chairman of
 the commission, any two members of the commission, or the
 commissioners court, or any two of any number of persons delegated
 by the commission with authority to sign vouchers, provided that
 the commission may, in such delegation, limit the authority of such
 persons and may require that each furnish a fidelity bond in such
 amount as the commission shall specify and subject to commission
 approval;
 (3)  carefully preserve all orders for the payment of
 money; and
 (4)  render a correct account to the commissioners
 court of all matters relating to the financial condition of the
 district as often as required by the commissioners court.
 (b)  The district treasurer is not[; and
 [(5)  not be] required to sign a check drawn on a
 depository selected under Section 62.156, unless the district
 treasurer is the designated officer of the district, as defined by
 Section 60.271(g).
 (c) [(b)]  A designated officer of a district may make a
 payment on behalf of the district by a check drawn on a depository
 selected under Section 62.155 in a manner consistent with the
 payment procedures adopted under Section 60.271(f) without
 authorization by the district treasurer.
 SECTION 11.  The following provisions of the Water Code are
 repealed:
 (1)  Section 62.076;
 (2)  Section 62.077(a); and
 (3)  Section 62.115(b).
 SECTION 12.  To the extent of any conflict, this Act controls
 over another Act of the 86th Legislature, Regular Session, 2019,
 relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted
 codes.
 SECTION 13.  This Act takes effect immediately if it
 receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each
 house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.
 If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate
 effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *