Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB772 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 772
 (In the Senate - Filed February 12, 2019; March 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 9,
 Nays 0; April 8, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to evidence in certain civil actions of a person's failure
 to forbid handguns on certain property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Title 4, Civil Practice and Remedies Code, is
 amended by adding Chapter 95A to read as follows:
 CHAPTER 95A. ACTIONS INVOLVING THE CARRYING OF HANDGUNS ON CERTAIN
 PROPERTY
 Sec. 95A.0001.  EVIDENCE OF FAILURE TO FORBID HANDGUNS. The
 fact that a card, sign, or other document described by Section
 30.06(c)(3) or 30.07(c)(3), Penal Code, is not posted on the
 property of a business or any other evidence that a person failed to
 exercise the person's option to forbid the carrying of a handgun by
 a license holder on the property:
 (1)  is not admissible as evidence in a trial on the
 merits in an action:
 (A)  against a person, including a business or
 other entity, who owns, controls, or manages the property; and
 (B)  in which the cause of action arises from an
 injury sustained on the property; and
 (2)  does not support a cause of action described by
 Subdivision (1) against a person described by that subdivision.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 95A, Civil Practice and Remedies Code,
 as added by this Act, does not apply to a cause of action that
 accrued before the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *