Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB799 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/14/2019

                    By: Alvarado, et al. S.B. No. 799
 (Murphy)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of a business advisory council to provide
 advice on economic recovery following a disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 418, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 418.054 to read as follows:
 Sec. 418.054.  BUSINESS ADVISORY COUNCIL. (a)  In this
 section, "advisory council" means the business advisory council
 established under this section.
 (b)  The business advisory council is established to provide
 advice and expertise on actions state and local governments can
 take to assist businesses in recovering from a disaster.
 (c)  The advisory council is composed of 12 members who
 represent business in this state appointed as follows:
 (1)  four members appointed by the governor;
 (2)  four members appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 and
 (3)  four members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives.
 (d)  Members of the advisory council serve staggered
 four-year terms.
 (e)  An advisory council member is not entitled to
 compensation but is entitled to reimbursement for travel expenses
 incurred by the member while conducting the business of the
 advisory council.
 (f)  The advisory council members shall elect a presiding
 officer from among the members.
 (g)  The advisory council shall:
 (1)  advise the division on policies, rules, and
 program operations to assist businesses in recovering from a
 disaster;
 (2)  advise the division on the state resources and
 services needed to assist businesses in recovering from a
 catastrophic loss of electric power; and
 (3)  propose solutions to address inefficiencies or
 problems in the state or local governmental disaster response with
 respect to impact on businesses and the economy.
 (h)  The advisory council shall meet at the times and
 locations determined by the presiding officer, not to exceed four
 meetings each year.
 (i)  Not later than November 1 of each even-numbered year,
 the advisory council shall submit a report on the advisory
 council's activities, advice, and proposed solutions to the
 division, the governor, the lieutenant governor, and the speaker of
 the house of representatives.
 (j)  The division shall provide administrative support to
 the advisory council.
 (k)  Chapter 2110 does not apply to the advisory council.
 SECTION 2.  As soon as practicable after the effective date
 of this Act, the governor, lieutenant governor, and speaker of the
 house of representatives shall appoint members to the business
 advisory council, as required by Section 418.054, Government Code,
 as added by this Act, as follows:
 (1)  the governor shall appoint two members to terms
 expiring February 1, 2021, one member to a term expiring February 1,
 2022, and one member to a term expiring February 1, 2023;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor shall appoint one member
 to a term expiring February 1, 2021, two members to terms expiring
 February 1, 2022, and one member to a term expiring February 1,
 2023; and
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives shall
 appoint one member to a term expiring February 1, 2021, one member
 to a term expiring February 1, 2022, and two members to terms
 expiring February 1, 2023.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.