Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB86 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/03/2019

                    By: Hall S.B. No. 86
 (In the Senate - Filed November 12, 2018; February 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Intergovernmental
 Relations; April 3, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 1;
 April 3, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 86 By:  Schwertner


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the regulation of raising or keeping chickens by a
 municipality or a property owners' association.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 217, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter D to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D.  MISCELLANEOUS REGULATORY AUTHORITY
 Sec. 217.051.  SIX CHICKENS ALLOWED ON SINGLE-FAMILY
 RESIDENTIAL LOT. (a)  Notwithstanding any other law and except as
 provided by Subsection (b), a municipality may not adopt or enforce
 an ordinance that prohibits the raising or keeping of six or fewer
 chickens on a single-family residential lot.
 (b)  A municipality may impose reasonable regulations on the
 raising or keeping of poultry on a single-family residential lot
 that do not have the effect of prohibiting the raising or keeping of
 six or fewer chickens, including:
 (1)  a limit on the number of chickens that may be
 raised or kept in excess of six;
 (2)  a prohibition on breeding poultry;
 (3)  a prohibition on raising or keeping roosters; or
 (4)  the minimum distance between a chicken coop and a
 residential structure.
 (c)  An ordinance adopted by a municipality that violates
 Subsection (a) is void.
 SECTION 2.  Chapter 202, Property Code, is amended by adding
 Section 202.020 to read as follows:
 Sec. 202.020.  SIX CHICKENS ALLOWED ON SINGLE-FAMILY
 RESIDENTIAL LOT. (a)  Notwithstanding Section 202.002(a), this
 section applies only to a restrictive covenant created on or after
 September 1, 2019.
 (b)  Notwithstanding any other law and except as provided by
 Subsection (c), a property owners' association may not adopt or
 enforce a restrictive covenant that prohibits the raising or
 keeping of six or fewer chickens on a single-family residential
 lot.
 (c)  A property owners' association may adopt and enforce a
 restrictive covenant imposing reasonable requirements on the
 raising or keeping of poultry on a single-family residential lot
 that do not have the effect of prohibiting the raising or keeping of
 six or fewer chickens, including:
 (1)  a limit on the number of chickens that may be
 raised or kept in excess of six;
 (2)  a prohibition on breeding poultry;
 (3)  a prohibition on raising or keeping roosters; or
 (4)  the minimum distance between a chicken coop and
 another lot.
 (d)  A provision that violates Subsection (b) is void.
 SECTION 3.  Subchapter D, Chapter 217, Local Government
 Code, as added by this Act, applies to an ordinance adopted before,
 on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *