Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB904 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/08/2019

                    By: Hughes S.B. No. 904
 (In the Senate - Filed March 8, 2019; March 11, 2019, read
 first time and referred to Committee on State Affairs;
 April 8, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 2; April 8, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 904 By:  Hughes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the use of governmental communications systems to
 distribute political advertising; providing a civil penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 255.003(a) and (b), Election Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  An officer or employee of a political subdivision may
 not knowingly spend or authorize the spending of public funds,
 including by use of government communications systems, such as
 electronic communications, for political advertising.
 (b)  Subsection (a) does not apply to a communication that
 factually describes the purposes of a ballot measure if the
 communication does not advocate passage or defeat of the measure.
 SECTION 2.  Section 255.0031(d)(1), Election Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (1)  "Internal mail system" means a system operated by
 a state agency or political subdivision to deliver written
 documents or electronic communications to officers or employees of
 the agency or subdivision.
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 255, Election Code, is amended by adding
 Sections 255.009 and 255.010 to read as follows:
 Sec. 255.009.  MISUSE OF GOVERNMENT RESOURCES BY THIRD
 PARTY. (a)  A person, political campaign, or advocacy group may
 not misuse government resources by causing political advertising to
 be delivered to an e-mail address issued by this state or by a
 political subdivision of this state.
 (b)  For each government-issued e-mail address receiving an
 e-mail described by Subsection (a), the person, political campaign,
 or advocacy group sending the e-mail is liable for a civil penalty
 of $100 if:
 (1)  the attorney general, a district attorney, or a
 county attorney notified the person, political campaign, or
 advocacy group that an e-mail was delivered in violation of
 Subsection (a); and
 (2)  the person, political campaign, or advocacy group,
 after receiving notice of the violation, delivered an e-mail in
 violation of Subsection (a) to the same e-mail address.
 (c)  The attorney general, a district attorney, or a county
 attorney may enforce this provision.
 Sec. 255.010.  DEFINITION. In this chapter, "electronic
 communications" means any communication facilitated by the use of
 any electronic device, including a cellular telephone, computer,
 computer network, personal data assistant, or pager.  The term
 includes e-mails, text messages, instant messages, and any
 communications made through a mobile application for electronic
 devices or through an Internet website.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *