Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB939 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/24/2019

                    By: Creighton S.B. No. 939
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2019; March 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Business & Commerce;
 April 24, 2019, reported adversely, with favorable Committee
 Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; April 24, 2019,
 sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR S.B. No. 939 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the limitations periods for certain suits against real
 estate appraisers and appraisal firms.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter A, Chapter 16, Civil Practice and
 Remedies Code, is amended by adding Section 16.013 to read as
 follows:
 Sec. 16.013.  REAL ESTATE APPRAISERS AND APPRAISAL FIRMS.
 (a)  In this section:
 (1)  "Appraisal" has the meaning assigned by Section
 1103.003, Occupations Code.
 (2)  "Appraisal review" has the meaning assigned by
 Section 1104.003, Occupations Code.
 (3)  "Real estate appraisal firm" means an entity
 engaging a real estate appraiser as an owner, member, shareholder,
 partner, employee, or independent contractor to perform an
 appraisal or appraisal review.
 (4)  "Real estate appraiser" means an individual
 licensed or certified under Chapter 1103, Occupations Code.
 (b)  Except for a suit based on fraud or breach of contract, a
 person must bring suit for damages or other relief arising from an
 appraisal or appraisal review conducted by a real estate appraiser
 or appraisal firm not later than the earlier of:
 (1)  two years after the day the person knew or should
 have known the facts on which the action is based; or
 (2)  five years after the day the appraisal or
 appraisal review was completed.
 SECTION 2.  Section 16.013, Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a cause of action that
 accrues on or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *