Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SB948 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/16/2019

                    By: Kolkhorst S.B. No. 948
 (In the Senate - Filed February 21, 2019; March 1, 2019,
 read first time and referred to Committee on Water & Rural Affairs;
 April 16, 2019, reported favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7,
 Nays 0; April 16, 2019, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to release sites for breeder deer.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter L, Chapter 43, Parks and Wildlife
 Code, is amended by adding Section 43.361 to read as follows:
 Sec. 43.361.  RELEASE SITES. (a)  A release site onto which
 breeder deer are liberated must be surrounded by a fence not less
 than seven feet in height that is capable of retaining deer at all
 times under reasonable and ordinary circumstances.
 (b)  The owner of a release site is responsible for ensuring
 that the fence surrounding the release site and infrastructure
 associated with the fence are in a condition to retain deer as
 provided by Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2019.
 * * * * *