Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR24 Introduced / Bill

Filed 12/20/2018

                    86R2417 CJC-D
 By: Kolkhorst, et al. S.J.R. No. 24


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the appropriation
 of the net revenue received from the imposition of state sales and
 use taxes on sporting goods.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-d to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-d.  (a) For each state fiscal year, the net revenue
 received from the collection of any state taxes imposed on the sale,
 storage, use, or other consumption in this state of sporting goods
 that were subject to taxation on January 1, 2019, under Chapter 151,
 Tax Code, is automatically appropriated when received to the Parks
 and Wildlife Department and the Texas Historical Commission, or
 their successors in function, and is allocated between those
 agencies as provided by general law. The legislature by general law
 may provide limitations on the use of money appropriated under this
 subsection.
 (b)  In this section, "sporting goods" means an item of
 tangible personal property designed and sold for use in a sport or
 sporting activity, excluding apparel and footwear except that which
 is suitable only for use in a sport or sporting activity, and
 excluding board games, electronic games and similar devices,
 aircraft and powered vehicles, and replacement parts and
 accessories for any excluded item.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 86th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2019, requiring the automatic appropriation of the
 net revenue received from the collection of state taxes imposed on
 the sale, storage, use, or other consumption in this state of
 certain sporting goods to the Parks and Wildlife Department and the
 Texas Historical Commission.
 (b)  Section 7-d, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2021, and applies only to state tax revenue
 collected on or after that date.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment requiring the
 automatic appropriation of the net revenue received from the
 collection of state taxes imposed on the sale, storage, use, or
 other consumption in this state of certain sporting goods to the
 Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas Historical Commission."