Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR24 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/21/2019

                    S.J.R. No. 24


 proposing a constitutional amendment relating to the appropriation
 of the net revenue received from the imposition of state sales and
 use taxes on sporting goods.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article VIII, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 7-d to read as follows:
 Sec. 7-d.  (a)  Subject to Subsection (b) of this section,
 for each state fiscal year, the net revenue received from the
 collection of any state taxes imposed on the sale, storage, use, or
 other consumption in this state of sporting goods that were subject
 to taxation on January 1, 2019, under Chapter 151, Tax Code, is
 automatically appropriated when received to the Parks and Wildlife
 Department and the Texas Historical Commission, or their successors
 in function, and is allocated between those agencies as provided by
 general law. The legislature by general law may provide
 limitations on the use of money appropriated under this subsection.
 (b)  The legislature by adoption of a resolution approved by
 a record vote of two-thirds of the members of each house of the
 legislature may direct the comptroller of public accounts to reduce
 the amount of money appropriated to the Parks and Wildlife
 Department and the Texas Historical Commission, or their successors
 in function, under Subsection (a) of this section.  The comptroller
 may be directed to make that reduction only:
 (1)  in the state fiscal year in which the resolution is
 adopted, or in either of the following two state fiscal years; and
 (2)  by an amount that does not result in a reduction of
 more than 50 percent of the amount that would otherwise be
 appropriated to the Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas
 Historical Commission, or their successors in function, in the
 affected state fiscal year under Subsection (a) of this section.
 (c)  Money appropriated to the Parks and Wildlife Department
 and the Texas Historical Commission, or their successors in
 function, under Subsection (a) of this section may not be
 considered available for certification by the comptroller of public
 accounts under Section 49a(b), Article III, of this constitution.
 (d)  In this section, "sporting goods" means an item of
 tangible personal property designed and sold for use in a sport or
 sporting activity, excluding apparel and footwear except that which
 is suitable only for use in a sport or sporting activity, and
 excluding board games, electronic games and similar devices,
 aircraft and powered vehicles, and replacement parts and
 accessories for any excluded item.
 SECTION 2.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a)  This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 86th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2019, dedicating the revenue received from the
 existing state sales and use taxes that are imposed on sporting
 goods to the Texas Parks and Wildlife Department and the Texas
 Historical Commission to protect Texas' natural areas, water
 quality, and history by acquiring, managing, and improving state
 and local parks and historic sites while not increasing the rate of
 the state sales and use taxes.
 (b)  Section 7-d, Article VIII, of this constitution takes
 effect September 1, 2021, and applies only to state tax revenue
 collected on or after that date.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2022.
 SECTION 3.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or against the
 proposition:  "The constitutional amendment dedicating the revenue
 received from the existing state sales and use taxes that are
 imposed on sporting goods to the Texas Parks and Wildlife
 Department and the Texas Historical Commission to protect Texas'
 natural areas, water quality, and history by acquiring, managing,
 and improving state and local parks and historic sites while not
 increasing the rate of the state sales and use taxes."
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 24 was adopted by the Senate
 on April 10, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 0; and that
 the Senate concurred in House amendment on May 21, 2019, by the
 following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 I hereby certify that S.J.R. No. 24 was adopted by the House,
 with amendment, on April 23, 2019, by the following vote: Yeas 143,
 Nays 1, one present not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 Received:
 ______________________________
 Date
 ______________________________
 Secretary of State