Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SJR72 Introduced / Bill

Filed 03/08/2019

                    86R12098 CJC-D
 By: Bettencourt S.J.R. No. 72


 A JOINT RESOLUTION
 proposing a constitutional amendment providing for the creation of
 and use of money in the education enrichment fund; allocating
 certain general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization
 fund, and the state highway fund.
 BE IT RESOLVED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 49-g(c), (c-1), (d), and (e), Article
 III, Texas Constitution, are amended to read as follows:
 (c)  Not later than the 90th day of each fiscal year, the
 comptroller of public accounts shall transfer from the general
 revenue fund to the economic stabilization fund, [and] the state
 highway fund, and the education enrichment fund the sum of the
 amounts described by Subsections (d) and (e) of this section, to be
 allocated as provided by Subsection [Subsections] (c-1) [and (c-2)]
 of this section. However, if necessary and notwithstanding the
 allocations prescribed by Subsection [Subsections] (c-1) [and
 (c-2)] of this section, the comptroller shall reduce
 proportionately the amounts described by Subsections (d) and (e) of
 this section to be transferred and allocated to the economic
 stabilization fund to prevent the amount in that fund from
 exceeding the limit in effect for that biennium under Subsection
 (g) of this section. Revenue transferred to the state highway fund
 under this subsection may be used only for constructing,
 maintaining, and acquiring rights-of-way for public roadways other
 than toll roads.
 (c-1)  The comptroller shall allocate [Of] the sum of the
 amounts described by Subsections (d) and (e) of this section and
 required to be transferred from the general revenue fund under
 Subsection (c) of this section in the manner provided by the
 legislature by general law [, the comptroller shall allocate
 one-half to the economic stabilization fund and the remainder to
 the state highway fund, except as provided by Subsection (c-2) of
 this section].
 (d)  If in the preceding year the state received from oil
 production taxes a net amount greater than the net amount of oil
 production taxes received by the state in the fiscal year ending
 August 31, 1987, the comptroller shall transfer under Subsection
 (c) of this section and allocate in accordance with Subsection
 [Subsections] (c-1) [and (c-2)] of this section an amount equal to
 75 percent of the difference between those amounts.  The
 comptroller shall retain the remaining 25 percent of the difference
 as general revenue.  In computing the net amount of oil production
 taxes received, the comptroller may not consider refunds paid as a
 result of oil overcharge litigation.
 (e)  If in the preceding year the state received from gas
 production taxes a net amount greater than the net amount of gas
 production taxes received by the state in the fiscal year ending
 August 31, 1987, the comptroller shall transfer under Subsection
 (c) of this section and allocate in accordance with Subsection
 [Subsections] (c-1) [and (c-2)] of this section an amount equal to
 75 percent of the difference between those amounts.  The
 comptroller shall retain the remaining 25 percent of the difference
 as general revenue.  For the purposes of this subsection, the
 comptroller shall adjust the computation of revenues to reflect
 only 12 months of collection.
 SECTION 2.  Article III, Texas Constitution, is amended by
 adding Section 49-g-6 to read as follows:
 Sec. 49-g-6.  (a) The education enrichment fund is
 established as a fund in the state treasury.
 (b)  The education enrichment fund consists of:
 (1)  money transferred to the fund under Section 49-g
 of this article;
 (2)  money appropriated to the fund by the legislature;
 (3)  money that the legislature by statute dedicates
 for deposit to the credit of the fund;
 (4)  gifts or grants contributed to the fund; and
 (5)  investment earnings and interest earned on amounts
 credited to the fund.
 (c)  The legislature may appropriate money from the
 education enrichment fund only to provide funding for primary and
 secondary education.
 SECTION 3.  Section 49-g(c-2), Article III, Texas
 Constitution, is repealed.
 SECTION 4.  The following temporary provision is added to
 the Texas Constitution:
 TEMPORARY PROVISION. (a) This temporary provision applies
 to the constitutional amendment proposed by the 86th Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2019, providing for the creation of the education
 enrichment fund, dedicating the money in that fund for primary and
 secondary education, and providing for the transfer of certain
 general revenues to that fund, the economic stabilization fund, and
 the state highway fund.
 (b)  Section 49-g-6, Article III, of this constitution, as
 added by the amendment, and the amendments to Section 49-g, Article
 III, of this constitution, take effect January 1, 2020.
 (c)  This temporary provision expires January 1, 2021.
 SECTION 5.  This proposed constitutional amendment shall be
 submitted to the voters at an election to be held November 5, 2019.
 The ballot shall be printed to permit voting for or against the
 proposition: "The constitutional amendment providing for the
 creation of the education enrichment fund, dedicating the money in
 that fund for primary and secondary education, and providing for
 the transfer of certain general revenues to that fund, the economic
 stabilization fund, and the state highway fund."