Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR338 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 03/07/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 338
 In Memory
 of
 Faith Christine Barcroft
 WHEREAS, The untimely passing of Faith Christine Barcroft of
 Gatesville on February 20, 2019, at the age of 39, has brought a
 profound loss to the family and friends of this beloved woman; and
 WHEREAS, Born at a military hospital in Landstuhl,
 Germany, on January 7, 1980, the former Faith Henshoher was the
 daughter of Frances and David Henshoher; she grew up with the
 companionship of a brother, Luke, and traveled frequently during
 her youth due to her father's army career; after moving with her
 family to Gatesville, she went on to graduate from Gatesville
 High School in 1998 and subsequently continued her studies at
 Central Texas College; and
 WHEREAS, On November 25, 2000, she married her high school
 sweetheart, Jack Barcroft; she was a loving and supportive wife,
 and she embraced her role as a mother to their two children,
 Aubrey and Megan, whom she enthusiastically encouraged in all of
 their school and athletic activities; and
 WHEREAS, A woman of resolute faith, Ms. Barcroft belonged to
 the Presbyterian Church of Gatesville; in her leisure time, she
 found great pleasure in tending to her garden, crafting gifts for
 her friends, and organizing gatherings to bring her circle of loved
 ones together; she had an adventurous and optimistic spirit that
 brightened the days of everyone around her, and she was known and
 admired for always putting the needs of others ahead of her own; and
 WHEREAS, Although the passing of Faith Barcroft leaves a
 tremendous void in the lives of those who held her dear, they will
 forever treasure their memories of the warmth and kindness she
 shared with them; now, therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the memory of Faith Christine
 Barcroft and extend heartfelt condolences to the members of her
 family:  to her mother, Frances Henshoher; to her husband, Jack
 Barcroft; to her children, Aubrey and Megan Barcroft; to her
 brother, Luke Henshoher, and his wife, Lori; and to her other
 relatives and many dear friends; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for her family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Faith Christine Barcroft.
 Buckingham
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on March 7, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate