Texas 2019 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR861 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/28/2019

                    SENATE RESOLUTION NO. 861
 In Memory
 of
 William James Boring
 WHEREAS, A rich and purposeful life drew to a close with
 the passing of William James Boring of Tyler on April 5, 2019, at
 the age of 89; and
 WHEREAS, Jamie Boring was born to Annie Mae and Fletcher
 Boring on October 4, 1929, in Tyler, and he grew up with two
 siblings, Nancy and Gary; a graduate of Tyler High School, he
 enlisted in the U.S. Marine Corps at the end of World War II and
 became an intelligence officer, specializing in high speed
 intercept cryptography and later training air force and army
 officers; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Boring continued his education at North Texas
 State University, where he earned a master's degree in
 accounting; he went on to enjoy a successful and varied career
 that included owning the Tyler Employment Agency, working as a
 sales manager for Western Foundry, and making a name for himself
 as a real estate agent and developer; and
 WHEREAS, Mr. Boring took an active role in his community,
 serving as chair of the Smith County Appraisal Review Board and
 as a member of the Tyler Board of Realtors Ethics Committee and
 the Texas Department of Transportation Right of Way Board; strong
 in his faith, he worshipped at Green Acres Baptist Church and
 attended Bible study with his dear friends for more than 40
 years; he was cherished deeply and regarded as a role model by
 many people, who admired him for his warmth, his integrity, and
 his commitment to the needs of others; and
 WHEREAS, On April 19, 1968, Mr. Boring married his high
 school sweetheart and the love of his life, the former Joan
 Vanderpool, who preceded him in death in 2006; he took great
 pride in his children, Nancy, Elizabeth, and John, and he had the
 pleasure of welcoming into the family seven grandchildren,
 Elizabeth, Amanda, Sarah, Cal, Rachel, Jamie, and Bryce, as well
 as three great-grandchildren, Brooklynn, Blake, and William; and
 WHEREAS, Although Jamie Boring is deeply missed, memories
 of his wisdom, his kindness, and his devotion to his loved ones
 remain to comfort and inspire those he leaves behind; now,
 therefore, be it
 RESOLVED, That the Senate of the State of Texas, 86th
 Legislature, hereby pay tribute to the life of William James
 Boring and extend sincere condolences to all who mourn his
 passing; and, be it further
 RESOLVED, That an official copy of this Resolution be
 prepared for his family and that when the Texas Senate adjourns
 this day, it do so in memory of Jamie Boring.
 Hughes
  ________________________________
  President of the Senate
  I hereby certify that the
  above Resolution was adopted by
  the Senate on May 27, 2019, by a
  rising vote.
  ________________________________
  Secretary of the Senate
  ________________________________
  Member, Texas Senate