Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate 2019 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR182

In memory of Wayne H. Holtzman.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR183

Recognizing February 12, 2019, as Rita L. Littlefield Kidney Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR184

Recognizing The University of Texas at El Paso for attaining the R1 designation.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR185

Commending Diana Natalicio for her service as president of The University of Texas at El Paso.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR186

Recognizing February 14, 2019, as Texas Council on Family Violence Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR187

Proclaiming June of 2019 Kier's Hope Sickle Cell Awareness Month.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR188

Recognizing the 2019 Texas Birthday Bash in Navasota.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR189

Congratulating Reb and Nancy Bacchus on the occasion of their 50th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR19

Declaring February 19, 2019, Nurse Day at the Capitol.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR190

Recognizing February 19, 2019, as Panhandle Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR191

Recognizing February 21, 2019, as Andrews County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR192

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as San Patricio County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR193

Welcoming members of Leadership Gainesville to the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR194

Recognizing February 20, 2019, as Texas Dental Association Legislative Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR195

Declaring February 26, 2019, Live Oak County Historical Commission Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records