Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate 2019 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR222

Recognizing February 21, 2019, as Leadership Rowlett Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR223

Proclaiming February 21, 2019, Williamson County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR224

Recognizing February 26, 2019, as Sheriffs' Association of Texas Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR225

Recognizing February 25, 2019, as University of Houston-Victoria Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR226

Recognizing February 20, 2019, as Texas Energy Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR227

In memory of Garrett Willis Hull.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR228

Recognizing Community Development Financial Institutions.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR229

In memory of Ryan Keith Wallace.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR23

Commending Juan E. Mejia for his commitment to higher education.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR230

Recognizing February 26, 2019, as Ward County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR231

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Snyder Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR232

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as United Way's Community Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR233

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Lubbock Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR234

In memory of John Ingram.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR235

In memory of Glen L. Rekeweg.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records