Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate 2019 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR25

Recognizing James Etta Robinson Wilson for 50 years of membership in Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR250

Recognizing February 26, 2019, as East Texas Coalition Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR251

In memory of Ann Elizabeth Lee.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR252

Recognizing February 26, 2019, as Space Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR253

Congratulating Abigail Rose Arias for being named an honorary Texas Ranger.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR254

Recognizing PediPlace health care on the occasion of its 25th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR255

Recognizing February 28, 2019, as Hopkins County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR256

Recognizing the Texas Heritage and Independence Celebration Association, Incorporated.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR257

Recognizing Weatherford College on the occasion of its 150th anniversary.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR258

Recognizing February 19, 2019, as Tarleton State University Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR259

Recognizing February 25, 2019, as Parker County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR26

Recognizing Louella Joyce Gill Anderson for 50 years of membership in Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Incorporated.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR260

Recognizing Fidel Esteban Mendoza on the occasion of his retirement.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR261

Recognizing the Star Fest Cookoff.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR262

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Howard County Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records