Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate 2019 Bills & Legislation

TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR303

Recognizing March 5, 2019, as Van Zandt County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR304

In memory of David G. Noyola.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR305

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Texas A&M University--Corpus Christi Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR306

Proclaiming March 4, 2019, 9-1-1 Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR307

Welcoming the Kenedy County delegation to the State Capitol.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR308

Recognizing March 5 and 6, 2019, as Harlingen-San Benito Days.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR309

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as Richardson/Telecom Corridor Legislative Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR31

Recognizing February 12, 2019, as Wharton County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR310

Recognizing March 5, 2019, as Brazoria County Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR311

Recognizing March 6, 2019, as The University of Texas at Arlington Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR312

Recognizing March 5, 2019, as Frisco Independent School District Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR313

Recognizing the Bay Area Houston Economic Partnership, the Clear Lake Area Chamber of Commerce, and the League City Regional Chamber of Commerce for their contributions to Bay Area Houston.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR314

Recognizing February 27, 2019, as Chemistry Technology Day.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR315

Recognizing Stephen Mansfield for his career in the health care field.
TX

Texas 2019 - 86th Regular

Texas Senate Bill SR316

Recognizing March 5, 2019, as Texas Tech University System Day.

Research Filters

States
Terms / Sessions
Date Range
Chamber Records